Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Dale L Somers
Case #: 2:25-bk-20314
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Premier Tillage, Inc.
2572 County Road 76
Quinter, KS 67752-9535
Represented By
Neil Steven Sader
Sader Law Firm LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee 301 North Main Suite 1150
Wichita, KS 67202
Represented By
John Nemecek
Doj-Ust
contact info
Jordan M Sickman
Doj-Ust
contact info
Richard A Kear
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 6:07 PM CDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
102 102 motion Expediting Hearing Fri 05/16 4:25 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] Filed on behalf of Debtor Premier Tillage, Inc., with Certificate of Service.(McCormack, Bradley)
Related: [-] 101 Generic Motion
Att: 1 Matrix
101 101 motion Generic Motion Fri 05/16 4:24 PM
Motion for Approve the Bid Procedures and Approve the Sale of Assets Outside of the Ordinary Course of Business Free and Clear of Liens Filed on behalf of Debtor Premier Tillage, Inc., with Certificate of Service.(McCormack, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Matrix
Thursday, May 15, 2025
100 100 epo Continue Hearing Fri 05/16 3:21 PM
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING. Reason for continuance: Court's decision. So ORDERED by s/ Dale L. Somers . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 5/22/2025 at 01:30 PM Kansas City Courtroom 144 for89 and for50 and for39 , (kjd) THE MOVING PARTY IS TO SERVE THIS ORDER ON PARTIES NOT RECEIVING ELECTRONIC NOTICE AND FILE A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT. (When filing a certificate of service for this order, relate it back to the epo category.)
Related: [-] 39 Application to Employ, 50 Objection, 89 Response
99 99 court Courtroom Minute Sheet Fri 05/16 3:15 PM
Courtroom Minute Sheet (DLS), Ruling: Matters have not been resolved. Court will continue to May 22nd, 2025 at 1:30PM Related [+] (kjd)
Related: [-] 39 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Premier Tillage, Inc.,50 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee,89 Response filed by Debtor Premier Tillage, Inc.
98 98 misc Request for Notice Thu 05/15 10:45 AM
Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial. (Youngblood, Mandy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
97 97 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 05/14 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 05/14/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 93 Clerk Notice of Claim Filed Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 501(c)
96 96 misc Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, UST Form 11-MOR) Wed 05/14 9:51 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Debtor Premier Tillage, Inc.. (McCormack, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
95 95 notice Objection Deadline Tue 05/13 2:59 PM
Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 6/12/25 at 1:46 pm. Certificate of Service on 5/13/25. Filed by Thomas J. Lasater on behalf of Northwest Kansas Economic Innovation Center, Inc. Related [+] Objections due by 6/3/2025. (Lasater, Thomas)
Related: [-] 94 Motion for Adequate Protection Filed on behalf of Creditor Northwest Kansas Economic Innovation Center, Inc., with Certificate of Service.
94 94 motion Adequate Protection Tue 05/13 2:57 PM
Motion for Adequate Protection Filed on behalf of Creditor Northwest Kansas Economic Innovation Center, Inc., with Certificate of Service.(Lasater, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
93 93 court Clerk Notice of Claim Filed Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 501(c) Mon 05/12 8:43 AM
Clerk Notice of Claim Filed Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 501(c) (kns)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set (Motion) Mon 05/12 8:15 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing to be held on 6/12/2025 at 01:46 PM Kansas City Courtroom 144 for91 and for82 , (kns)
Related: [-] 82 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Banterra Bank,91 Response filed by Debtor Premier Tillage, Inc.
Saturday, May 10, 2025
92 92 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/10 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 90 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay
Friday, May 09, 2025
91 91 answer Response Fri 05/09 10:29 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Debtor Premier Tillage, Inc. (McCormack, Bradley)
Related: [-] 82 Motion for Relief from Stay . Fee Amount $199, filed by Creditor Banterra Bank