Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Juan R Sanchez
Case #: 2:25-cv-01415
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
FRANKLIN MINT FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Plaintiff
MIYOSHI ALLEN
5800 N. 15TH STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19141


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
7 7 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/02 3:28 PM
MIYOSHI ALLEN APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS.(JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
misc Remark Tue 04/22 7:51 AM
PAPER #6 AND FORMS MAILED TO PRO SE (JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/21 1:05 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF MIYOSHI ALLENSSECOND MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO. 5), IT IS ORDERED THAT: MIYOSHIS MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUTPREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUFFICIENT FINANCIAL INFORMATION TO ALLOW THE COURT TO DETERMINEWHETHER SHE HAS THE MEANS TO PAY THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND ALLEN AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TOPROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. IF ALLEN SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SHE SHALL WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OFTHE DATE OF THIS ORDER, COMPLETE THE FORM IN A MANNER THAT MAKES CLEAR TO THE COURT HOW SHE IS SUPPORTING HERSELF AND THAT CLARIFIES THE ISSUES NOTED ABOVE. IF ALLEN FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HER CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUTFURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 4/21/25.4/21/25 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/07 9:18 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MIYOSHI ALLEN..(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/21 4:06 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUFFICIENT FINANCIAL INFORMATION TO ALLOW THE COURT TO DETERMINE WHETHER SHE HAS THE MEANS TO PAY THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/21/25.3/21/25 ENTERED. COPY OF THIS ORDER AND NON-PRISONER IFP APPLICATION MAILED TO ALLEN.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
misc Remark Wed 03/19 9:05 AM
Copy of Pro Se Guidelines Notice (#3) and E-consent form mailed to Allen. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
3 3 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Tue 03/18 12:07 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. Not mailed to Allen.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 E-notice consent form
2 2 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/18 12:02 PM
COMPLAINT against FRANKLIN MINT FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, filed by MIYOSHI ALLEN. *IFP PENDING*(fdc) Modified on 3/18/2025 (md).
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/18 12:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MIYOSHI ALLEN..(fdc)
Related: [-]