New Mexico District Court
Case #: 1:25-mj-00468
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 1:37 AM MDT
Defendant
Erlend Olson (1)
Represented By
Nicholas Sitterly
Sitterly Law Firm
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Mindy Pirkovic
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sarah Jane Mease
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/19/2025 2:24 AM MDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
Attorney update in case as to Erlend Olson. Attorney Nicholas Sitterly for Erlend Olson added. (nm)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Erlend Olson: Initial Appearance set for 3/17/2025 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (khs) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Rule 5 Documents Received from the District of Columbia as to Erlend Olson (cl)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Clerk's Minutes before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings as to Erlend Olson held; Identity/Detention Hearing for Rule 5 set for 3/20/2025 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom Related [+] (kd)
Related: [-] cording Info: Liberty-Rio Grande
4 4 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (kd) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORAL ORDER of Temporary Detention pending hearing as to Erlend Olson by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (kd) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
Related: [-]
6 6 102 pgs Government's Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention by USA as to Erlend Olson. (nm)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nicholas Sitterly appearing for Erlend Olson (Sitterly, Nicholas)
Related: [-]