New York Western District Court
Case #: 6:25-cr-06046
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 3:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Raysean Brown (1)
Represented By
David R. Morabito
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Everardo A. Rodriguez
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Rochester
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/19/2025 3:45 AM EDT
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
1 1 40 pgs COMPLAINT as to Raysean Brown (1). (JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Raysean Brown. (JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Case as to Raysean Brown (1). Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 1/28/2025.(JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
Arrest of Raysean Brown (JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Raysean Brown. Attorney David R. Morabito for Raysean Brown added., Set/Reset Hearings as to Raysean Brown:( Initial Appearance set for 2/4/2025 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen.) (JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings as to Raysean Brown:( Initial Appearance set for 2/4/2025 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY before Hon. Colleen D. Holland.), Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Raysean Brown: (JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Raysean Brown (JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute entry for proceedings held before the Hon. Colleen D. Holland. Appearances: David Morabito, Esq., with defendant; Everado A. Rodriguez, AUSA; Sarah Cole, USPO. Initial appearance as to Raysean Brown held on 2/4/2025. Defendant advised of charges and rights. Defendant acknowledges and understands the charges brought against him. Defendant requests Court appointed counsel. David Morabito, Esq., appointed after review of Defendant's financial affidavit. Government moves to unseal the criminal complaint; the Court grants. Government moves for detention based on risk of flight and danger to the community. Defendant reserves rights to both a preliminary hearing and a detention hearing at this time, requests a brief adjournment to review information provided by USPO, discuss his custodial status with counsel, and further discuss with counsel whether to pursue a preliminary hearing or move towards pretrial resolution. A status conference is set for 2/11/2025 at 1:00 PM before Hon. Mark J. Pedersen in Courtroom 5, 1st Floor, 100 State Street, Rochester NY. Order regarding continuing Brady obligation read into the record and acknowledged by the government, written order to follow. Time is excluded as to Raysean Brown under 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(1)(D) due to the continued pendency of the government's motion for detention. Defendant remains in custody. (FTR Recording). (DAF). Modified on 2/5/2025 to reflect the government's application to unseal. (DAF). [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Regarding Continuing Brady Obligation as to Raysean Brown. Signed by Hon. Colleen D. Holland on 02/04/2025.(CDH) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Raysean Brown. (JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
7 7 TEXT ORDER as to Raysean Brown re 4 Minute Entry: Status Conference RESET for 2/11/2025 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. PLEASE NOTE THE CHANGE IN TIME . Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 2/5/2025.(JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Status Conference as to Raysean Brown held on 2/11/2025. Appearances: David R. Morabito, Esq.; Everardo A. Rodriguez, AUSA. Deft requests a Detention Hearing. Detention Hearing set for 2/18/2025 at 10:45 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED UNDER 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(1)(D) BASED ON THE PENDING DETENTION MOTION. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Detention Hearing as to Raysean Brown held on 2/18/2025. Appearances: David R. Morabito, Esq.; Everardo A. Rodriguez, AUSA; Kristen Nenni, USPO. Govt proceeds by proffer. Deft provides rebuttal. The Court will recess for 24-hours to consider the presented arguments. Regarding the underlying proceedings, the parties request a 30-day adjournment to review discovery and begin resolution discussions. The following proceedings are scheduled: Detention Hearing set to continue 2/19/2025 at 3:00 PM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. Status Conference/Set PH Date set for 3/18/2025 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME EXCLUDED FROM 2/18/2025 TO 3/18/2025 FOR REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Detention Hearing as to Raysean Brown held on 2/19/2025. Appearances: David R. Morabito, Esq.; Everardo A. Rodriguez, AUSA; Kristen Nenni, USPO. After arguments presented, the Court will consider Deft's release on conditions, which would include a $200,000.00 appearance bond secured by cash and property. Deft requests 1-week to acquire the necessary information and resources to effectuate the bond. Govt indicates it will seek an appeal of the release decision once filed to a District Judge. Detention Hearing set to continue 2/27/2025 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. TIME REMAINS EXCLUDED. Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
11 11 3 pgs Letter filed by Raysean Brown (Morabito, David) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
12 12 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Raysean Brown held on 2/18/25 before Judge Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Brandi Wilkins, scalisba@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/18/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2025. (Wilkins, Brandi) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Raysean Brown held on 2/19/25 before Judge Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Brandi Wilkins, scalisba@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/18/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2025. (Wilkins, Brandi) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
14 14 2 pgs Letter filed by Raysean Brown (Morabito, David) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
15 15 TEXT ORDER as to Raysean Brown re14 Letter filed by Raysean Brown: The continued Detention Hearing shall be adjourned until 3/6/2025 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. Time remains excluded under 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) until 3/18/2025 for the reasons discussed in open court on 2/19/2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 2/26/2025.(JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen:Detention Hearing as to Raysean Brown continued on 3/6/2025. Appearances: David R. Morabito, Esq.; Everardo A. Rodriguez, AUSA; Kristen Nenni, USPO. The Court denies Govt's motion for detention and will impose conditions of release, including the imposition of a $190,000 Bond. $100,000 of said Bond will be secured by property owned by 1 surety, and the additional unsecured $90,000 will be secured by 10 sureties. The Court will stay the Order Setting Conditions of Release at the request of the Govt while they prepare to file an appeal of the release decision to a District Judge. Parties request a 1-week adjournment, the Court sets the following appearances: Status Conference set for 3/12/2025 at 3:00 PM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen for purposes of providing an update as to Deft's potential release conditions, and further as to whether or not additional charges are forthcoming. Status Conference remains set for 3/18/2025 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen for purposes of providing an update as to the underlying case and the status of potential resolution discussions. TIME REMAINS EXCLUDED UNDER 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) UNTIL 3/18/2025 (See ECF No. 9 Minute Entry). Deft remains in custody. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Raysean Brown (1). Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 3/6/2025.(JB) **Per the Hon. Mark W. Pedersen, this release order is STAYED until 5:00 PM EST on Friday, March 7, 2025 to permit time for the Government to file an appeal of this order, and further to request a continued stay of this order from the District Judge assigned to the appeal proceedings. [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
Remark re 18 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court: Case Number 25-MR-6034 assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford (JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
18 18 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by USA re Order #17(Rodriguez, Everardo) Modified on 3/7/2025 to terminate motion and correct docket text (JB). [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-6
19 19 TEXT ORDER staying17 Order setting conditions of release entered on March 6, 2025, by United States Magistrate Judge Mark W. Pedersen until further order of the Court. The government is directed to arrange for the preparation of the transcript of the March 6, 2025 proceedings before Judge Pedersen. An appearance before the undersigned will also be scheduled pending counsels' availability. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/7/2025.(DPS) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
20 20 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (CONTINUATION OF DETENTION HEARING) as to Raysean Brown held on 03/06/2025 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARK W. PEDERSEN. Transcriber KAREN J. CLARK, KARENCLARK1013@AOL.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/31/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2025. (KJC) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
21 21 TEXT ORDER as to Raysean Brown: In light of the Government's filing of an appeal of the undersigned's decision to a District Judge (ECF No.18 now filed in case number 25-MR-6034), the parties are advised of the following changes to the Court's calendar concerning Raysean Brown: The Status Conference set for 3/12/2025 at 3:00 PM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen is hereby ADJOURNED. The Oral Argument set for 3/17/2025 at 10:30 AM before Hon Elizabeth A. Wolford REMAINS SET (see case number 25-MR-6034, ECF No. 4). The Status Conference set for 3/18/2025 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen is hereby RESET TO 2:00 PM. Time remains excluded under 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) through 3/18/2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 3/11/2025.(JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
22 22 MOTION to Adjourn by Raysean Brown. (Morabito, David) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
23 23 TEXT ORDER granting22 Motion to Adjourn Status Conference as to Raysean Brown (1). The Status Conference shall be adjourned until 3/26/2025 at 2:30 PM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. At Defendant's request, time is excluded in the interests of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161 (h)(7)(A) until the adjourn date. I find that the Defendant's and the public's interest in a speedy trial are outweighed by the Defendant's interest in having sufficient time to prepare for appeal proceedings with the Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford, and further continue potential plea negotiations with the Government. Should the parties need additional time to continue resolution discussions, a request must be filed, in writing, no less than 2 business days in advance of the new scheduled date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 3/17/2025.(JB) [6:25-mj-00514-MJP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
24 24 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Raysean Brown (1) count(s) 1, 2. (JHF)
Related: [-]
25 25 Sealed Unredacted Document as to Raysean Brown filed pursuant to FRCrP 49.1. (JHF)
Related: [-]
26 26 TEXT ORDER OF REFERRAL: Hon. Mark W. Pedersen, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: All pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including all pre-trial matters that a Magistrate Judge may hear and determine pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A), and those which a Magistrate Judge may hear and thereafter file a report and recommendation for disposition pursuant to Section 636(b)(1)(B). All procedural aspects of matters properly before the Magistrate Judge under this Order, including scheduling and the filing of briefs or other supporting material, shall be determined by the Magistrate Judge. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/18/25. (JHF)
Related: [-]