California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Referred: Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:25-cv-02195
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 5:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Carbahn Motorsports, LLC
Represented By
Jennifer J. Lee
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stephen J. Dinan
Plaintiff
Powerteq LLC
Represented By
Edward D Lanquist, Jr
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC
contact info
Scott M. Douglass
Baker Donelson
contact info
Brian John Wagner
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
19 19 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 04/08 11:59 AM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Carbahn Motorsports, LLC. (Lee, Jennifer) Modified on 4/8/2025 (kam2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/01 9:05 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Powerteq LLC. Service waived by Stephen J. Dinan waiver sent on 3/21/2025, answer due 5/20/2025. (Douglass, Scott)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 04/01 8:59 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Powerteq LLC on CarBahn Motorsports, LLC (Douglass, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/19 8:50 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2025 at 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
15 15 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/18 11:11 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge P. Casey Pitts and Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
14 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
13 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Powerteq LLC.. (Douglass, Scott)
Related: [-]
12 12 Summons Issued as to Stephen J. Dinan. (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 Summons Issued as to Carbahn Motorsports, LLC. (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
10 10 ORDER. Signed 3/12/2025 by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Edward D. Lanquist, Jr. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 Order. Signed 3/12/2025 by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Scott Douglass.(klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
8 8 Proposed Summons. (Wagner, Brian)
Related: [-]
7 7 Proposed Summons. (Wagner, Brian)
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Edward D. Lanquist ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20430457.) filed by Powerteq LLC. (Lanquist, Edward)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Scott M. Douglass ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20430231.) filed by Powerteq LLC. (Douglass, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/18/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
2 2 2 pgs Certificate of Interested Entities by Powerteq LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hot Rod Brands Inc., Corporate Parent B&M Racing & Performance Products Inc., Corporate Parent High Performance Industries, Inc., Corporate Parent Holley High Performance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Holley Purchaser, Inc., Corporate Parent Holley Intermediate Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Holley Inc., Corporate Parent Empower Sponsor Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Holley Parent Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Empower Funding, LLC for Powerteq LLC. re1 Complaint (Wagner, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 299 pgs COMPLAINT against Carbahn Motorsports, LLC, Stephen J. Dinan ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20412156.). Filed by Powerteq LLC.(Wagner, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet