Oregon District Court
Judge:Karin J Immergut
Case #: 3:25-cv-00463
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 3:43 AM PDT
Defendant
Columbia Empire Farms, Inc.
Defendant
Pacific Northwest Aggregates, Inc.
Defendant
Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.
Defendant
Robert B. Pamplin
Defendant
R.B. Pamplin Corporation
Plaintiff
Old Republic Surety Company
Represented By
Loren D. Podwill
Bullivant Houser Bailey PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 03/20 9:55 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Columbia Empire Farms, Inc., Pacific Northwest Aggregates, Inc., Robert B. Pamplin, R.B. Pamplin Corporation, Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (gd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
6 6 service Proposed Summons Wed 03/19 3:42 PM
Amended Proposed Summons Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co. Filed by Old Republic Surety Company. (Podwill, Loren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Robert B Pamplin,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons RB Pamplin Corp,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Pacific Northwest Aggregates,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Columbia Empire Farms
5 5 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Wed 03/19 1:03 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 7/17/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/18/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 8/18/2025. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (gd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
4 4 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/18 10:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Old Republic Surety Company. (Podwill, Loren)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_doc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/18 10:06 PM
Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,1 . Filed by Old Republic Surety Company. (Podwill, Loren)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Proposed Summons Tue 03/18 9:58 PM
Proposed Summons Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co. Filed by Old Republic Surety Company. (Podwill, Loren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Robert B Pamplin,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons RB Pamplin Corp,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Pacific Northwest Aggregates,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Columbia Empire Farms
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/18 9:24 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9783756 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Old Republic Surety Company against Old Republic Surety Company. (Podwill, Loren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1