New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:14-cv-09895
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2014
Terminated:Sep 07, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Jun 13, 2015 11:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Imperial Holdings Inc.
Represented By
Marisa A. Marinelli
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Levine
Represented By
Elan Abraham Gershoni
O'Quinn Stumphauzer & Sloman
contact info
Ryan Dwight O'Quinn
O'Quinn Stumphauzer & Sloman
contact info
Defendant
Washington Square Financial LLC
Represented By
Marisa A. Marinelli
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Defendant
Imperial Finance & Trading LLC
Represented By
Marisa A. Marinelli
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Lafontant
Represented By
Edward S. Stone
Edward S. Stone, Esq
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 07, 2016
54 54 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed Thu 09/08 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Michael Lafontant, by his undersigned counsel, hereby dismisses his claims in the First Amended Complaint without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/7/16) (yv)
Related: [-]
53 53 misc Letter Wed 09/07 5:27 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Marisa Marinelli dated September 7, 2016 re: re response to Plaintiff's letter dated September 6, 2016, ECF No. 52.. Document filed by Imperial Finance & Trading LLC, Imperial Holdings Inc., Washington Square Financial LLC.(Marinelli, Marisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
52 52 misc Letter Tue 09/06 6:07 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Edward S. Stone, Esq. dated 09/06/2016 re: Voluntary Dismissal. Document filed by Michael Lafontant.(Stone, Edward)
Related: [-]
51 51 misc Letter Tue 09/06 4:20 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Marisa Marinelli dated September 6, 2016 re: status update, cancel Sept. 9, 2016 conference and dismiss this case with prejudice.. Document filed by Imperial Finance & Trading LLC, Imperial Holdings Inc., Washington Square Financial LLC.(Marinelli, Marisa)
Related: [-]