Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brenda K Martin
Case #: 2:25-bk-02295
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Apr 22, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC
7272 E Indian School Rd Ste 540
Scottsdale, AZ 85251-3996
Represented By
ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN
Allan D Newdelman PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
ZCHAPTER 11 FMC
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
29 29 order oApproving Wed 05/14 3:32 PM
ORDER Approving Stipulation For Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral And Plan Treatment signed on 5/14/2025 Related [+] . (LAR)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation
28 28 audio audio Wed 05/14 9:49 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [05/07/2025 01:32:21 PM]. File Size [ 3321 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:58 ]. (audiouser)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
27 27 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Fri 05/09 6:34 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC Related [+].(NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation
26 26 other Certificate of Service and No Objections Fri 05/09 6:32 AM
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC. Related [+] (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation,19 Notice of Bar Date,20 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
25 25 order oMinute Entry Order Wed 05/07 4:00 PM
ORDER , Minute Entry for Hearing Held 05/07/2025 signed on 5/7/2025 Related [+] Hearing set for 7/10/2025 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing . (RIV)
Related: [-] 10 Order Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference
Thursday, April 24, 2025
23 23 trustee Minutes of 341 Meeting Thu 04/24 8:01 AM
First Minutes of 341 Meeting Held 4/22/25 @ 9:45 a.m. filed by PATTY CHAN of OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(Griffiths, Dale)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
22 22 other Certificate of Service Fri 04/18 10:57 AM
Certificate of Service filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC. Related [+] (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-] 21 Pre-Status Conference Report
21 21 other Pre-Status Conference Report Fri 04/18 9:50 AM
Pre-Status Conference Report filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC. Related [+] (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-] 10 Order Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference
Monday, April 14, 2025
20 20 other Certificate of Service Mon 04/14 8:12 AM
Certificate of Service filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC. Related [+] (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation,19 Notice of Bar Date
19 19 notice Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of) Mon 04/14 7:44 AM
Notice of Bar Date filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC Related [+] Objections/Responses due by 5/5/2025,.(NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation
18 18 other Stipulation Mon 04/14 7:40 AM
Stipulation For Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral and Plan Treatment filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC. (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 29, 2025
17 17 notice Appearance (Notice of) Sat 03/29 10:27 PM
Notice of Appearance NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICES filed by DAWN M. MAGUIRE of Trustee Maguire on behalf of DAWN M. MAGUIRE.(MAGUIRE, DAWN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
16 16 court zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE) Wed 03/26 9:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part
15 15 court Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Tue 03/25 9:28 AM
Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (RJA)
Related: [-]
14 14 court BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part Mon 03/24 7:38 AM
Chapter 11 Corp/Part Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/22/2025 at 09:45 AM via Telephonic Hearing (341) Complaints under Sections 727 or 523 due by 6/23/2025. Proof of Claims due by 5/28/2025, (RIV)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
12 12 other Certificate of Service Fri 03/21 7:12 AM
Certificate of Service filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC. Related [+] (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-] 10 Order Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference
Thursday, March 20, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 03/22 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference
11 11 3 pgs trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Thu 03/20 3:48 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee (Dawn Maguire) . filed by PATTY CHAN of OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(CHAN, PATTY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A - Maguire Verified Stmt
10 10 order oChapter 11 Status Conference (BKM/MCW/PS Form) Thu 03/20 3:28 PM
ORDER Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference signed on 3/20/2025 Hearing set for 5/7/2025 at 01:30 PM as a Telephonic Hearing Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 4/23/2025 . (JAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
9 9 order oEmploy (Application to) Thu 03/20 7:41 AM
ORDER Granting Application to Employ Related [+] signed on 3/19/2025 . (RIV)
Related: [-] 5
8 8 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 03/19 2:37 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC Related [+].(NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-] 5 Application to Employ
7 7 other Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016 Wed 03/19 2:35 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016 filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC. (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
6 6 other Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014 Wed 03/19 2:34 PM
Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014 filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC. (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
5 5 7 pgs motion Employ (Application to) Wed 03/19 2:30 PM
Application to Employ Counsel filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC. (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance (Notice of) Wed 03/19 8:24 AM
Notice of Appearance & Request for Notices filed by PATTY CHAN of OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(CHAN, PATTY)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Wed 03/19 7:03 AM
Notice of Filing Addendum to the Petition filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC.(NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Wed 03/19 6:47 AM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 4/22/2025 at 09:45 AM as a Telephonic Hearing (341). (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs other 2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1738.00 fee) Wed 03/19 6:43 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 04/9/2025, Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/17/2025. filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of VACATION OWNERSHIP CONSULTANTS, LLC (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Wed 03/19 6:47 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:25-bk-02295] ) [other,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A37338897. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]