Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:25-bk-00656

Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Henry W Van Eck
Case #: 1:25-ap-00013
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Reserve at Paxton Creek, LP
900 Reserve Way
Harrisburg, PA 17110
Represented By
Reserve at Paxton Creek, LP
contact info
Defendant
Prothonotary of Dauphin County
Dauphin County Courthouse 101 Market Street, Suite 101
Harrisburg, PA 17101
Represented By
Prothonotary of Dauphin County
contact info
Plaintiff
Delores Ann Robinson
813 Reserve Way
Harrisburg, PA 17110
Represented By
Gary J Imblum
Imblum Law Offices, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
5 5 misc Request for Entry of Default Mon 04/28 1:49 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Gary J Imblum of Imblum Law Offices, P.C. on behalf of Delores Ann Robinson Related [+]. (Imblum, Gary)
Related: [-] 1 ,3 ,4
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate of Service (or Certificate of Mailing) Wed 03/19 9:24 AM
Certificate of Service with Summons, Complaint for Turnover of Property of the Estate and Exhibit A Filed by Gary J Imblum of Imblum Law Offices, P.C. on behalf of Delores Ann Robinson Related [+]. (Imblum, Gary)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
3 3 court Summons (original, amended, reissued, third-party) Wed 03/19 8:06 AM
Summons setting answer dates, issued for plaintiff to serve Related [+]. Answers to Complaint/Summons are due on: 4/18/2025. Answers to Complaint/Summons by the United States or an office or agency thereof are due on: 4/23/2025. (Ratchford, Patricia)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 court Filing fee not required Wed 03/19 8:02 AM
Filing fee not required. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. (Ratchford, Patricia)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/18 1:39 PM
Adversary case 1:25-ap-00013. Complaint Filed by Gary J Imblum on behalf of Delores Ann Robinson against Reserve at Paxton Creek, LP, Prothonotary of Dauphin County. Filing Fee due in the amount of $ 350.00. Certificate of Service of the Complaint and Summons is due by: 06/16/2025. 11 Related [+] (Imblum, Gary)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of property
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order