Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:25-bk-10314

Tennessee Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Jimmy L Croom
Case #: 1:25-ap-05015
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Main Street Acquisition Corp
799 Estate Place
Memphis, TN 38120
Represented By
Main Street Acquisition Corp
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffery Wayne Saxton
92 Jackson Street
Bethel Springs, TN 38315
Represented By
Richard H. Walker
Walker Walker & Walker
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
court Notice Of Continuance Thu 05/08 1:00 PM
Notice Of Continuance Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 06/26/2025 at 10:00 AM Room 342, Jackson, TN. (dap ) Auto-docketed(CPA)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 25-05015 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)): Complaint by Jeffery Wayne Saxton against Main Street Acquisition Corp.
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate Of Service (Use For Jackson Cases) Tue 03/25 5:21 PM
Certificate Of Service Filed by Richard H. Walker on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffery Wayne Saxton Related [+]. (Walker, Richard)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
2 2 court Summons And Notice Of Pretrial Conference Wed 03/19 11:31 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 10:00 AM Room 342, Jackson, TN . (dap)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 25-05015 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)): Complaint by Jeffery Wayne Saxton against Main Street Acquisition Corp.
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/18 4:20 PM
Adversary case 25-05015 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)): Complaint by Jeffery Wayne Saxton against Main Street Acquisition Corp. (Walker, Richard)
Related: [-]