Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-11763

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:August B Landis
Case #: 2:25-ap-01107
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
MILANI LEE ACOSTA
1350 W. HORIZON RIDGE PKWY #1921
HENDERSON, NV 89012
Represented By
MILANI LEE ACOSTA
contact info
Plaintiff
SHELLEY D KROHN, TRUSTEE
PO Box 34690
LAS VEGAS, NV 89133
Represented By
SHELLEY D KROHN
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/15 11:57 AM
Summons Service Executed on Erik Severino 4/15/2025 Filed by SHELLEY D KROHN on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+] (KROHN, SHELLEY)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued.
Thursday, March 20, 2025
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 03/20 9:10 AM
Summons Service Executed on MILANI LEE ACOSTA 3/20/2025 Filed by SHELLEY D KROHN on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+] (KROHN, SHELLEY)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN,4 Summons Issued.
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
4 4 court Summons Issued Wed 03/19 9:50 AM
Summons Issued on MILANI LEE ACOSTA (ccc)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Wed 03/19 9:50 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 8/12/2025 at 10:00 AM at ABL Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
2 2 cmp Request to Issue Summons Tue 03/18 5:51 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: MILANI LEE ACOSTA. Filed by SHELLEY D KROHN on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN (KROHN, SHELLEY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/18 5:50 PM
Adversary case 25-01107 Complaint TO REVOKE DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR Filed by SHELLEY D KROHN vs. MILANI LEE ACOSTA Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount $350. (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))(KROHN, SHELLEY)
Related: [-]