District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Timothy J Kelly
Case #: 1:25-cv-00817
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 5:47 AM EDT
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By
M. Jared Littman
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Represented By
Chris Bryant
National Student Legal Defense Network
contact info


Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/21 7:35 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Littman, M.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/16 9:28 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. For the reasons set forth in Defendant's8 Consent Motion, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's8 Consent Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's1 Complaint by May 21, 2025. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/16/2025. (lctjk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to Tue 04/15 5:18 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Littman, M.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by M. Jared Littman on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Littman, M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Fri 03/28 5:01 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/28/2025. (Bryant, Chris)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Fri 03/28 5:00 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 3/28/2025 (Bryant, Chris)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney Fri 03/28 4:59 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/21/2025. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/20/2025. (Bryant, Chris)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 03/20 9:02 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/20 8:54 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
2 2 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Wed 03/19 4:27 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Bryant, Chris)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/19 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11553925) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK.(Bryant, Chris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons