Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Case #: 6:25-cv-00486
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2025
Terminated:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 6:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Volusia County
Plaintiff
James Griffin
395 Bill France Blvd Apt 18
Daytona Beach, FL 32114


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 04/04 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 04/03 3:24 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case re 4 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/3/2025. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 04/02 8:56 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by James Griffin. (JOS) (e-portal)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
3 3 order Order Fri 03/21 11:26 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective April 1, 2024, and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued a Standing Order, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/21/2025. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
2 2 service Summons issued Wed 03/19 3:11 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Volusia County. (JOS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/19 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Volusia County Filing fee $405.00, receipt number ORL-114576 filed by James Griffin.(JOS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet