Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:25-cv-00676
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause42:4072 Payment of Flood Insurance Claim
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 5:10 PM EDT
Defendant
Frontline Insurance Unlimited Company
Represented By
Ryan Martin Bennett
Nielsen & Treas, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kaliope Skourellos


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to amended complaint Thu 04/17 3:52 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 11 Amended Complaint by First Protective Insurance Company.(Bennett, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
12 12 notice Compliance notice Tue 04/01 5:06 PM
NOTICE of compliance re6 Case Management Scheduling Order Parties' Joint Notice of Certification Regarding Familiarity with Local Rules and Orders Entered to Date by First Protective Insurance Company (Bennett, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/27 3:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against First Protective Insurance Company with Jury Demand. Terminating Frontline Insurance Unlimited Company filed by Kaliope Skourellos.(JDR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
10 10 order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Thu 03/27 8:51 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 9 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. The Clerk is directed to separately docket Plaintiff's amended complaint. (Dkt. 9-1) Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/27/2025. (AC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
9 9 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Wed 03/26 3:04 PM
First MOTION to Amend Complaint by Kaliope Skourellos.(Dowling, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/25 10:23 AM
ENDORSED ORDER STRIKING 5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. It appears the Motion was filed on behalf of the wrong party, perhaps due to a clerical error. Defendant is DIRECTED to re-file the Motion on behalf of the proper party if Defendant still seeks an extension of time to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/25/2025. (AC)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Protective Order Tue 03/25 9:42 AM
HURRICANE PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/25/2025.(BCH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
6 6 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 03/25 9:40 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: (HURRICANE) Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/25/2025. (BCH)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Fri 03/21 2:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal by Frontline Insurance Unlimited Company. (Bennett, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
4 4 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/20 8:49 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:25-cv-676-MSS-SPF. (ARL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/19 4:26 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Frontline Insurance Unlimited Company identifying Corporate Parent PWC Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent Frontline Unlimited Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Frontline Insurance Unlimited Company f/k/a Martingale National Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Frontline Unlimited Insurance Managers Inc., Corporate Parent Frontline Insurance Managers Inc. for Frontline Insurance Unlimited Company. (Bennett, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 03/19 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Ryan Martin Bennett on behalf of Frontline Insurance Unlimited Company. Lead Counsel: Ryan M. Bennett. (Bennett, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 03/19 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit in and for Pinellas County, Florida, case number 2025-000741-CI filed in State Court on February 18, 2025. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23147835 filed by Frontline Insurance Unlimited Company.(Bennett, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Service of Process,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents C - State Court Other Documents,
Att: 4 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet