California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:25-cv-02417
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2025
Terminated:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 2:07 PM PDT
Defendant
Laurie Ann Wheatland
Plaintiff
Angel Garcia
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
14 14 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 04/25 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Angel Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 10 pgs order Order Fri 04/18 4:34 PM
ORDER DECLINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: For the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(c)(4). (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
12 12 misc Response Fri 04/11 9:53 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Angel Garciato Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Thursday, March 27, 2025
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 03/28 10:55 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause within fourteen days of this order. (iv)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 03/28 10:54 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) STANDING ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The court finds that good cause exists to institute a limited scheduling order for cases under the ADA involving physical barriers in places of public accommodation. (iv)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 03/27 3:58 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/19 4:13 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Laurie Ann Wheatland. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/19 4:13 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/19 4:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/19 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 03/19 1:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Angel Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/19 1:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 03/19 1:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Angel Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/19 1:03 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: CCACDC-39333499 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Angel Garcia(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]