New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:25-cv-02277
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 5:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Joseph Michael Laura
Defendant
Ruediger Nuerk
Defendant
Robert Tarantula
Defendant
Pristec AG
Defendant
Pristec America
Defendant
Anthony Sichenzio
41 William Penn Road
Warren, NJ 07059
Plaintiff
Kyu Song Lee
Represented By
T. Edward Williams
Williams LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/20 11:46 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Joseph Michael Laura, Ruediger Nuerk, Pristec AG, Pristec America, Anthony Sichenzio, Robert Tarantula with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Kyu Song Lee. Related document:1 Complaint,..(Williams, T. Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
8 8 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 05/14 11:56 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:6 Letter filed by Kyu Song Lee. ENDORSEMENT: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1), a party may amend its pleading once without leave of Court up to 21 days after service. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A). The docket does not reflect that service has been effected on Defendants. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint on or before May 20, 2025. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/20/2025.) (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 5/14/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/13 12:45 AM
NOTICE of Notice of Errata re: Exhibit B re:6 Letter. Document filed by Kyu Song Lee..(Williams, T. Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Errata Exhibit B: Affidavit of T. Edward Williams, Esq.
Monday, May 12, 2025
6 6 misc Letter Mon 05/12 11:58 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from T. Edward Williams, Esq. dated 12 May 2025 re: Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Kyu Song Lee..(Williams, T. Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Amended Complaint
Monday, May 05, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 05/05 5:19 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before May 12, 2025, Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs submission shall include an affidavit attesting to any facts relevant to the diversity analysis, including the citizenship of all parties at the time of commencement of this action. If by May 12, 2025, Plaintiff fails to establish the requisite diversity of citizenship among the parties, then the Court may dismiss the case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without further notice. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Show Cause Response due by 5/12/2025. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 5/5/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/31 4:45 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney T. Edward Williams to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons, 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Caption error, all parties must be listed in caption. If all names do not fit in the space provided, name the first listed Defendant on the pleading followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 30, 2025
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Sun 03/30 7:12 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony Sichenzio, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kyu Song Lee..(Williams, T. Edward)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Sun 03/30 7:07 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Michael Laura, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kyu Song Lee..(Williams, T. Edward)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 03/20 10:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney T. Edward Williams. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Priste America, Inc., Pristec AG, an Austrian Company, Ruediger Nuerk, Sichenzio Anthony. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 03/20 10:52 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 03/20 10:53 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 03/20 10:54 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 03/19 4:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Williams, T. Edward)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/19 4:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Sichenzio Anthony, Joseph Michael Laura, Ruediger Nuerk, Priste America, Inc., Pristec AG, an Austrian Company, Robert Tarantula. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30792952)Document filed by Kyu Song Lee..(Williams, T. Edward)
Related: [-]