Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:25-cv-00279
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 6:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Safelite Group, Inc.
Represented By
Amanda Tiffany Quan
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Defendant
Safelite Group, Inc. Benefits Administrator
Represented By
Amanda Tiffany Quan
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly Key
Represented By
Philip J. Krzeski
Chestnut Cambronne PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 04/08 9:18 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2025 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/07 9:00 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff. Safelite Group, Inc. and Safelite Group, Inc. Benefits Administrator answer due 5/29/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/7/25. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/04 12:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 5/29/2025. by Defendants Safelite Group, Inc., Safelite Group, Inc. Benefits Administrator. (Quan, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Tue 04/01 5:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Safelite Group Benefits Administrator on 3 24-2025 filed by Plaintiff Kelly Key. (Krzeski, Philip)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Tue 04/01 5:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Safelite Group on 3 24-2025 filed by Plaintiff Kelly Key. (Krzeski, Philip)
Related: [-]
service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/02 9:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Safelite Group, Inc. & Safelite Group, Inc. Benefits Administrator. Both served on 3/24/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. The wrong event was used in filing docs 4 & 5 . The event utilized here produces an answer due date. (er)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 03/20 9:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Safelite Group, Inc. & Safelite Group, Inc. Benefits Administrator. (er)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 03/20 9:28 AM
Summons Issued as to Safelite Group, Inc., Safelite Group, Inc. Benefits Administrator. (jmt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/19 4:57 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action against Safelite Group, Inc., Safelite Group, Inc. Benefits Administrator ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10426401), filed by Kelly Key. (Krzeski, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form to Safelite Group,
Att: 3 Summons Form to Safelite Group Benefits Administrator