Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Referred: Dustin M Howell
Case #: 1:25-cv-00417
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Foreclosure
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 5:58 AM CDT
Defendant
706 W. 34th Street, LLC
Defendant
ABL RPC Residential Credit Acquisition, LLC
Represented By
Travis H. Gray
Jack O'Boyle & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Equity Trust Company Custodian
Represented By
Jeffrey Scott Taylor
Taylor Thuss, PLLC
contact info
Donald R. Taylor
Taylor Thuss PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Rice Capital, LLC
Plaintiff
Skyline Destinations, LLC
Represented By
Bradley Jordan Reeves
Hajjar Peters LLP
contact info
Brian Henry Buster
Hajjar Peters, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
13 13 motion Summary Judgment Thu 05/01 2:12 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by ABL RPC Residential Credit Acquisition, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Dustin M. Howell. (Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/29 4:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Equity Trust Company Custodian.(Taylor, Donald)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Tue 04/29 4:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Equity Trust Company Custodian.. Motions referred to Judge Dustin M. Howell. (Taylor, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/23 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley Jordan Reeves on behalf of Skyline Destinations, LLC. Attorney Bradley Jordan Reeves added to party Skyline Destinations, LLC(pty:pla) Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, Bradley
Monday, April 21, 2025
notice Deficiency Notice Mon 04/21 4:37 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 9 Answer to Complaint. Multiple Pleadings must be filed separately. Your document contains a Dispositive Motion and an Answer. Please refile each pleading as a separate document and event. Thank you. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/18 12:30 PM
Defendant Equity Trust Company's Motion to Dismiss and ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney Donald R. Taylor added to party Equity Trust Company Custodian(pty:dft) by Equity Trust Company Custodian.(Taylor, Donald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
8 8 notice Notice Tue 04/15 4:30 PM
NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES by ABL RPC Residential Credit Acquisition, LLC(Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Tue 04/15 4:25 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by ABL RPC Residential Credit Acquisition, LLC. (Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
6 6 7 pgs order Order Fri 04/04 9:27 AM
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f). Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
5 5 misc Supplement to Tue 04/01 4:13 PM
SUPPLEMENT to3 Order SUPPLEMENT TO INDEX OF DOCUMENTS FILED IN STATE COURT by ABL RPC Residential Credit Acquisition, LLC. (Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/21 12:24 PM
ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cr5)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order to File Pro Hac Motion Fri 03/21 12:22 PM
Order Directing Brian Henry Buster to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cr5)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/21 12:25 PM
STANDING ORDER (dated 02/27/2025) REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin M. Howell. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cr5)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 03/19 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ABL RPC RESIDENTIAL CREDIT ACQUISITION LLC, (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19935030), filed by ABL RPC RESIDENTIAL CREDIT ACQUISITION LLC,.(Gray, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/21 12:12 PM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Fri 03/21 12:13 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell. (cr5)
Related: [-]