Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Allen C Winsor
Referred: Michael J Frank
Case #: 5:25-cv-00072
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/09 3:34 PM
REFERRAL AND ORDER denying without prejudice 4 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/9/2025. (jcw)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/09 3:32 PM
ORDER re 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. On of before 5/30/2025 , Plaintiff shall file with this court a declaration, signed under penalty of perjury, stating: a. the total amount of money Plaintiff received in gifts (other than gifts deposited into his inmate trust account) during the past six months; b. the total amount of money Plaintiff received in inheritances during the past six months; and c. the total amount of money Plaintiff received from any other source (other than money deposited into his inmate trust account) during the past six months. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 5/9/2025. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/08 12:28 PM
MOTION for Extension of Timet by ROBERT STEVEN PRICE. (jcw)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 05/08 12:29 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re:4 MOTION for Extension of Time Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
3 3 notice Notice to Pro Se Wed 03/19 12:25 PM
Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 03/19 12:21 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,1 Complaint. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 03/19 12:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT STEVEN PRICE. (jcw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/19 12:17 PM
COMPLAINT against GULF COUNTY JAIL, filed by ROBERT STEVEN PRICE. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw)
Related: [-]