New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:25-cv-01934
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 6:43 AM EDT
Defendant
RAD DATA COMMUNICATIONS INC.
Plaintiff
AUTHPOINT LLC
Represented By
ANTRANIG NIAZ GARIBIAN
Garibian Law Offices PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
4 4 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 03/20 5:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTHPOINT LLC. (GARIBIAN, ANTRANIG)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 03/20 1:30 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to RAD DATA COMMUNICATIONS INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Thu 03/20 1:28 PM
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
qc QC - Fillable PDF Thu 03/20 1:11 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The AO120 Patent Form attached to the COMPLAINT at entry1 filed by ANTRANIG GARIBIAN on 03/18/2025 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Disclosure Statement filed as an Attachment Thu 03/20 1:12 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The1 COMPLAINT filed by ANTRANIG GARIBIAN on 03/18/2025 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 03/19 12:12 PM
Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT against RAD DATA COMMUNICATIONS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16097250) with JURY DEMAND , Related Case Selected , filed by AUTHPOINT LLC.(GARIBIAN, ANTRANIG) (Attachment 5 replaced on 3/20/2025) (mxw, ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Appearance of Counsel,
Att: 3 Corporate Disclosure,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Patent Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit 1,
Att: 7 Exhibit 2
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 03/19 11:49 AM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi added. (dmw)
Related: [-]