Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:25-cv-00315
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 6:41 AM CDT
Defendant
US Med-Equip, LLC
Represented By
J. Christopher Anderson
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nashville)
contact info
Colleen E. Mallea
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Zachary Hempel
Represented By
N. Chase Teeples
Yezbak Law Offices PLLC
contact info
Melody Fowler-Green
Yezbak Law Offices PLLC
contact info
Adam Rodrigues
Adam Rodrigues Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/08 3:43 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant US Med-Equip, LLC's second motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint (Docket No.13 ), which is represented to be unopposed and is therefore GRANTED. The time for Defendant US Med-Equip, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to May 13, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 05/08/2025. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 05/06 2:09 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Unopposed) by US Med-Equip, LLC. (Mallea, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/16 3:37 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant US Med-Equip, LLC's motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint (Docket No.11 ), which is represented to be unopposed and is therefore GRANTED. The time for Defendant US Med-Equip, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to May 6, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 04/16/2025. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 04/15 11:38 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Christopher Anderson admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 04/15 11:40 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Colleen E. Mallea admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/14 4:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Responsive Pleading by US Med-Equip, LLC. (Mallea, Colleen)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen E. Mallea on behalf of US Med-Equip, LLC (Mallea, Colleen)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by J. Christopher Anderson on behalf of US Med-Equip, LLC (Anderson, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/10 1:46 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Zachary Hempel. US Med-Equip, LLC served on 3/25/2025.(Teeples, N.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Green Card
Thursday, March 20, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/20 12:50 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/20/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Wed 03/19 6:07 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/23/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 03/19 6:04 PM
Summons issued as to US Med-Equip, LLC. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (mg)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Wed 03/19 6:01 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Wed 03/19 6:01 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Wed 03/19 6:00 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/19 6:00 PM
COMPLAINT against US Med-Equip, LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number BTNMDC-4282572), filed by Zachary Hempel.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Consent Form,
Att: 2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 03/19 6:08 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Melody Fowler-Green, N. Chase Teeples, Adam Rodrigues admitted to this court . (mg)
Related: [-]