California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 2:25-cv-02364
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 2:52 AM PDT
Defendant
Honorable David D. Gelfound
Defendant
Steven A. Simons
Defendant
Robert A. Wiener
Plaintiff
Yehoram Uziel
an individual 19329 Bryant Street
Northridge, CA 91324


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
11 11 order For Order Tue 05/20 11:26 PM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED.R.EVID.201 by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. Plaintiff Yehoram Uziel ("Plaintiff") has filed a Request for Judicial Notice7 ("Request") wherein he request that the Court take judicial notice of two documents pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 201 "in lieu of a certificate of proof of service of summons on Defendant Honorable Judge David B. Gelfound" Related [+]. Attached as Exhibit "2" is what appears to be a minute order and certificate of mailing from the Los Angeles County Superior Court in Case No. 24CHCV00898, Simons v DC Partners Inc., et al, pertaining to "a document...left with the Court's staff by Steven A. Simons." Accordingly, the Court takes judicial notice of Exhibit "2." However, the Court finds that Exhibit "2" is not sufficient to demonstrate proof of service of process on Defendant Gelfound for purposes of Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (rma)
Related: [-] quest at 1
Monday, May 12, 2025
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 05/12 7:08 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Yehoram Uziel, upon Defendant Steven A. Simons served on 5/5/2025, answer due 5/27/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Uziel, Yehoram)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 O Mon 05/12 5:33 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow: Granting6 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 05/08 3:21 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Yehoram Uziel, upon Defendant Robert A. Wiener served on 4/30/2025, answer due 5/21/2025. in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc For Judicial Notice Thu 05/08 1:20 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS PACKAGE ON DEFENDANT JUDGE DAVID B. GELFOUND filed by Plaintiff Yehoram Uziel. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Pro Se Electronic Filing - CV-5 Thu 05/08 1:16 PM
APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Yehoram Uziel. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order Fri 03/21 10:50 AM
ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (see document for details) (rma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Wed 03/19 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/19 1:04 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Yehoram Uziel. (ghap)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 03/19 1:03 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - Related [+],1 as to Defendants David D. Gelfound, Steven A. Simons, Robert A. Wiener. (ghap)
Related: [-] ferred
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Referred) Wed 03/19 1:01 PM
COMPLAINT filed against Defendants David D. Gelfound, Steven A. Simons, Robert A. Wiener Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow., FILED FEE 405: PAID filed by plaintiff Yehoram Uziel. (ghap) Modified on 3/19/2025 (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-71