Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00421
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 12:17 AM MST
Defendant
Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosas (1)
Represented By
Michael J Bresnehan
Michael J Bresnehan PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Regan L Pauls
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/20/2025 1:02 AM MST
Thursday, February 13, 2025
Arrest of Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosa on 2/13/2025. (MRH) [2:25-mj-06049-ASB]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosa. (MRH) [2:25-mj-06049-ASB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine: Initial Appearance as to Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosa held on 2/18/2025. DEFENDANT SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. IT IS ORDERED appointing CJA Attorney Michael Bresnehan for Defendant. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. The Government is seeking detention. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered detained pending trial as a flight risk. SPANISH Interpreter required for Defendant. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Margaret Perlmeter for the Government, CJA Attorney Michael Bresnehan for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Beatriz Bogard assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 2:59 PM to 3:07 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WMT) [2:25-mj-06049-ASB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine: Amending Doc. 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine: Initial Appearance as to Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosa held on 2/18/2025. DEFENDANT SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. IT IS ORDERED appointing CJA Attorney Michael Bresnehan for Defendant. Defendant states TRUE NAME to be JOSE ALBERTO SIQUEIROS-ROSAS. Further proceedings ordered in Defendant's true name. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. The Government is seeking detention. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered detained pending trial as a flight risk. SPANISH Interpreter required for Defendant. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Margaret Perlmeter for the Government, CJA Attorney Michael Bresnehan for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Beatriz Bogard assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 2:59 PM to 3:07 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WMT) Reason for Amendment: To reflect defendant's true name. (WMT) [2:25-mj-06049-ASB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
5 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine.(WMT)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:25-mj-06049-ASB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosas:The Court concludes that the following facts require the detention of the defendant pending further proceedings in this case. Findings of Fact and Statement of Reasons: (1) There is probable cause to believe that the defendant has committed an offense. (2) There is a serious risk that the defendant will not appear. (3) Defendant is a citizen of another country, illegally in the United States of America. (4) Defendant does not have sufficient ties to the community. (5) The reports from Pretrial Services Agency are adopted as the further findings of this Magistrate Judge. Conclusions of Law: (1) There is a serious risk that the defendant will flee. (2) No condition or combination of conditions will reasonably assure the appearance of the defendant as required. Directions Regarding Detention: The defendant is committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his/her designated representative for confinement in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal. The defendant shall be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with defense counsel. On order of a court of the United States or on request of an attorney for the Government, the person in charge of the corrections facility shall deliver the defendant to the United States Marshal for the purpose of an appearance in connection with a court proceeding. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 2/18/25. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WMT) [2:25-mj-06049-ASB]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
7 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict by Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosas. (Bresnehan, Michael) [2:25-mj-06049-ASB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
8 8 ORDER granting7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosas (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 2/25/25. (rkt) [2:25-mj-06049-ASB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
9 9 INFORMATION - Felony as to Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosas (1) count(s) 1. (SMF)
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosas. (SMF)
Related: [-]
11 11 CONSENT OF DEFENDANT Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosas for Guilty Plea Hearing before a United States Magistrate Judge. (SMF)
Related: [-]
12 12 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Judge Krissa M. Lanham. Filed by USA as to Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosas. (SMF)
Related: [-]
13 13 MINUTE ORDER as to Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosas: This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Boyle to conduct a plea hearing. (SMF)
Related: [-]
14 14 The parties having contacted the court, IT IS ORDERED, as to Jose Alberto Siqueiros-Rosas, Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/27/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle.(rkt)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]