Hawaii District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00021
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 9:29 PM HST
Defendant
Jillian Pecika (1)
Represented By
Birney B. Bervar
Bervar & Jones
contact info
Michael Green
contact info
Myles S. Breiner
Law Office Of Myles S. Breiner
contact info
Sharron I. Rancourt
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jonathan D. Slack
Prince Kuhio Federal Building
contact info
Wayne A. Myers
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/19/2025 10:24 PM HST
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
Arrest of Jillian Pecika on 5/14/2024. (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT; AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jillian Pecika (1) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/14/2024. (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
3 3 EO: as to Jillian Pecika - Initial Appearance is set for 05/15/2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Parties have been notified. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
4 4 EO: as to Jillian Pecika - Initial Appearance previously set for 10:30 a.m. IS CONTINUED TO 2:00 p.m. today, 05/15/2024 in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Parties have been notified. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
5 5 EO: as to Jillian Pecika - Initial Appearance previously set for 2:00 p.m. IS CONTINUED TO 3:30 p.m. today, 05/15/2024 in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Parties have been notified. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
6 6 EP: INITIAL APPEARANCE held. Defendant is present and in custody. Charges have been received. The Court reads the charges to the Defendant. The Court sets the following hearings: Preliminary hearing as to Defendant is set for June 5, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Rom Trader. The Court orders the United States to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Failing to timely do so may result in consequences such as sanctions, adverse jury instructions, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges. This order incorporates the provisions of the Court's February 1, 2021 General Order Regarding Rule 5(F). The Government and the Defendant having no objection to the Pretrial Recommendations. Court adopts Pretrial Services Recommendation. The Court advised the defendant of the following conditions of release and informed the defendant that the Pretrial Services officer can answer any questions about these conditions of release. Bail set at $50,000.00 UNSECURED Bond with the following conditions. (See attached Minutes for details) Abstract of Release filed. After the Court discussed the above conditions of release with the defendant, the Court advised that the defendant could be brought back before the Court for any violations and the Defendant could be detained pending trial thereafter. The defendant affirmed that he understood the above conditions of release, the consequences of violating these conditions and agrees to be bound by these conditions. These minutes will serve as the Conditions of Release IT IS SO ORDERED. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service for processing. Initial Appearance as to Jillian Pecika held on 5/15/2024. Preliminary Hearing is set for 6/5/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Bond set as to Jillian Pecika (1): $50,000 Unsecured. ***Procedural Interval start as to Jillian Pecika. ***Location start: LC as to Jillian Pecika. (FTR-CT 6 / 3:30 - 3:37) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
7 7 Abstract of Release as to Jillian Pecika. (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
8 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH THE GOVERNMENT MAY FILE INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION AND WAIVE THE PRELIMINARY HEARING; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/16/2024. ? IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Hearing is waived but the defendant reserves her right to seek a Preliminary Hearing at a later date. ? IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the period of time from the date of this Order to September 15, 2024, constitutes a period of delay which shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B). ***Time Excluded as to Jillian Pecika: (5/16/2024-9/15/2024) (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
9 9 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/14/2024 in case as to Jillian Pecika. (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
10 10 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MYLES S. BREINER, SEAN FITZSIMMONS, KYLE T. DOWD, AND ANDREW STRAND. by Jillian Pecika.(Breiner, Myles) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
11 11 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Jillian Pecika: A Hearing on ECF No.10 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel is set for 6/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
12 12 EO: On 6/10/2024, defense counsel, Myles Breiner, submitted an email request seeking permission for both he and his client, Defendant Jillian Pecika ("Defendant"), to appear remotely for the hearing on [ECF10 ] Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel scheduled for 6/14/2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. The request is GRANTED subject to the following: 1. Mr. Breiner may appear telephonically ; and 2. Defendant and another attorney from Mr. Breiner's office must appear in person . Mr. Breiner must call at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Call-in instructions are below: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864 (toll-free). Meeting ID: 161 5641 6035. If during the course of the hearing, the Court determines that technical or other practical issues interfere with a fair and efficient proceeding, the Court reserves the right to require defense counsel who is physically present to conduct the hearing on behalf of the defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER) (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
13 13 EO: as to Jillian Pecika - Due to the power outage at the Courthouse, the hearing on ECF No.10 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel is CONTINUED to 6/17/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Mr. Breiner may appear by phone using the following dial in information: Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. Defendant Jillian Pecika and another attorney from Mr. Breiner's office must appear in person . (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER) (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
14 14 EP: MOTION HEARING as to10 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel as to Defendant Jillian Pecika held. AUSA Jonathan Slack appeared on behalf of the United States. Mr. Myles Breiner appeared for the Defendant. Defendant present; not in custody. The Court held a Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel , ("Motion") ECF No. 10 . SEALED HEARING with defense counsel and Defendant only. (10:41 am - 10:46 am) Based upon the sealed portion of the hearing, specifically the discussion with counsel and the Defendant, the Court GRANTS the Motion . Mr. Breiner to prepare the Order. Court to appoint CJA counsel. Defendant to complete a financial affidavit after today's proceedings. Defendant to remain on current conditions of pretrial release. Motion Hearing as to Jillian Pecika held on 6/17/2024 re 10 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. as to Jillian Pecika: Granted (FTR-CT 7 / 10:40 am - 10:47 am ( Sealed: 10:41 - 10:46 )) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
15 15 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit - by Jillian Pecika (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
16 16 EO: Pursuant to ECF Nos.14 and15 , the Court appoints Attorney Sharron Rancourt and the Office of the Federal Public Defenders as Counsel for Defendant Jillian Pecika. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
17 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL re10 ,14 as to Jillian Pecika - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/18/2024. Attorney Myles S. Breiner terminated in case as to Jillian Pecika. (eta) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
Arrest of Jillian Pecika on 7/1/2024. (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
20 20 EO: as to Jillian Pecika - An OSC Why Pretrial Release Should Not Be Revoked is set for 7/2/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN) (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
21 21 EO: as to Jillian Pecika - At the request of counsel, the OSC Why Pretrial Release Should Not Be Revoked is CONTINUED to 1:00 p.m. the same day, 7/2/2024 , in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN) (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
22 22 EP: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRETRIAL RELEASE SHOULD NOT BE REVOKED hearing as to Defendant Jillian Pecika held. AUSA Jonathan Slack appeared on behalf of the United States. Sharron Rancourt appeared for the Defendant. Defendant present, in custody. Discussion held. Defense requests a continuance - GRANTED. Order to Show Cause Why Pretrial Release Should Not Be Revoked hearing is CONTINUED to 7/3/2024 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. OSC Why Pretrial Release Should Not Be Revoked as to Jillian Pecika held on 7/2/2024 OSC Why Pretrial Release Should Not Be Revoked is set for 7/3/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN (FTR-CT 7 / 1:05 pm - 1:10 pm) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN) (jo) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2024: # 1 Amended Minutes to reflect the presence of PTS Officer (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
23 23 EP: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRETRIAL RELEASE SHOULD NOT BE REVOKED hearing as to Defendant Jillian Pecika held. AUSA Jonathan Slack appeared on behalf of the United States. Sharron Rancourt appeared for the Defendant. Defendant present, in custody. Discussion held. Defense requests a further continuance - GRANTED. A Further Order to Show Cause Why Pretrial Release Should Not Be Revoked hearing is set for 7/8/2024 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. OSC Why Pretrial Release Should Not Be Revoked as to Jillian Pecika held on 7/3/2024 Further OSC Why Pretrial Release Should Not Be Revoked is set for 7/8/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN (FTR-CT 7 / 11:02 am - 11:11 am) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN) (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
24 24 EP: FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRETRIAL RELEASE SHOULD NOT BE REVOKED hearing as to Defendant Jillian Pecika held. AUSA Jonathan Slack appeared on behalf of the United States. Sharron Rancourt appeared for the Defendant. Defendant present, in custody. The Court held an Order to Show Cause Why Pretrial Release Should Not Be Revoked Hearing. Discussion held. After review of U.S. Pretrial Services' Reports, other documents on file, and the arguments of Counsel, the Court REVOKES Defendant's pretrial release as there is no condition or combination of conditions that will reasonably assure the appearance of the Defendant as required and the safety of the community. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. Further OSC Why Pretrial Release Should Not Be Revoked as to Jillian Pecika held on 7/8/2024 (FTR-CT 7 / 1:38 pm- 1:51 pm) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER BARRY M. KURREN) (jo) Docket Text Modified on 7/8/2024 (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
25 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Jacquelyn T. Esser. by Jillian Pecika.(Rancourt, Sharron) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Counsel,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
26 26 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Jillian Pecika - A hearing on ECF No.25 Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel is set for 7/10/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
27 27 EP: MOTION HEARING as to25 Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel as to Defendant Jillian Pecika held. AUSA Jonathan Slack appeared on behalf of the United States. Ms. Sharron Rancourt appeared for the Defendant. Defendant present and in custody. The Court held a Hearing on Counsel's Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel , ("Motion") ECF No. 25 . SEALED HEARING with defense counsel and Defendant only. (11:01 am - 11:05 am) Based upon the sealed portion of the hearing, specifically the discussion with counsel and the Defendant, the Court GRANTS the Motion . Ms. Rancourt to prepare the Order. Court to appoint new CJA counsel. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. Motion Hearing as to Jillian Pecika held on 7/10/2024 re 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney 25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. as to Jillian Pecika: Granted (FTR-CT 7 / 10:59 am - 11:06 am) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG) (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
28 28 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL as to Jillian Pecika re25 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 7/11/2024. (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
29 29 CJA 20 as to Jillian Pecika: Birney B. Bervar, Esq. added; Attorney Sharron I. Rancourt terminated as to Jillian Pecika - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 7/11/2024. (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
30 30 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL; DECLARATION OF COUNSEL; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BIRNEY BEVAR. by Jillian Pecika. (Bervar, Birney) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
31 31 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Jillian Pecika - A hearing on ECF No.30 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel is set for 7/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
32 32 EP: MOTION HEARING as to ECF No.30 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel as to Defendant Jillian Pecika held. AUSA Jonathan Slack appeared on behalf of the United States. Birney Bervar appeared for the Defendant. Defendant present and in custody. Discussion held. Mr. Bervar's oral motion to withdraw ECF No. 30 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - GRANTED. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal Service. Motion Hearing as to Jillian Pecika held on 7/22/2024 re 30 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney 30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Jillian Pecika: Withdrawn (FTR-CT 7 / 10:00 am - 10:01 am) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
33 33 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/1/2024 in case as to Jillian Pecika. (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
34 34 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: appearing for Jillian Pecika (Green, Michael) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
35 35 SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH THE GOVERNMENT MAY FILE INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION; ORDER as to Jillian Pecika - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 9/9/2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendant reserves her right to seek a Preliminary Hearing at a later date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the period of time from June 11, 2024 to October 30, 2024, constitutes a period of delay which shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B). ***Time Excluded as to Jillian Pecika: (6/11/2024-10/30/2024) (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
36 36 THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH THE GOVERNMENT MAY FILE INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION; ORDER as to Jillian Pecika - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 10/29/2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendant reserves her right to seek a Preliminary Hearing at a later date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the period of time from June 11, 2024 to November 30, 2024, constitutes a period of delay which shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B). ***Time Excluded as to Jillian Pecika: (6/11/2024-11/30/2024) (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
37 37 FOURTH STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH THE GOVERNMENT MAY FILE INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION; ORDER as to Jillian Pecika - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 11/29/2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendant reserves her right to seek a Preliminary Hearing at a later date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the period of time from June 11, 2024 to January 30, 2025, constitutes a period of delay which shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B). ***Time Excluded as to Jillian Pecika: (6/11/2024-1/30/2025) (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
38 38 FIFTH STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH THE GOVERNMENT MAY FILE INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION; ORDER as to Jillian Pecika - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/30/2025. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendant reserves her right to seek a Preliminary Hearing at a later date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the period of time from June 11, 2024 to March 19, 2025, constitutes a period of delay which shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B). ***Excludable started as to Jillian Pecika: (6/11/2024-3/19/2025 (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM] (Entered: 01/30/2025)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
39 39 SIXTH STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH THE GOVERNMENT MAY FILE INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION; ORDER as to Jillian Pecika - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 3/12/2025. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendant reserves her right to seek a Preliminary Hearing at a later date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the period of time from June 11, 2024 to April 4, 2025, constitutes a period of delay which shall be excluded under theSpeedy Trial Act, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B). ***Time Excluded as to Jillian Pecika: (6/11/2024-4/4/2025) (jni) [1:24-mj-00502-KJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
40 40 INFORMATION as to Jillian Pecika (1) count(s) 1. (jni)
Related: [-]