Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:25-cv-00319
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:504 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 6:41 AM CDT
Defendant
Contempora, Inc
Defendant
Stacy Haynes-Nelson
Defendant
Kamaria Nelson-Johnson
Plaintiff
Latara Sturgis
Represented By
Connor M. Blair
Buchalter, PC
contact info
Kaitlin E. White
Buchalter, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/22 10:20 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Latara Sturgis. Kamaria Nelson-Johnson waiver sent on 4/18/2025. (Blair, Connor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Thu 03/20 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/23/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ab)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Thu 03/20 2:04 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Latara Sturgis. (Blair, Connor)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 03/20 10:35 AM
Summons issued as to Contempora, Inc, Stacy Haynes-Nelson, Kamaria Nelson-Johnson. (ab)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Thu 03/20 10:23 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ab)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Thu 03/20 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ab)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Thu 03/20 10:22 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ab)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 03/20 2:13 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Connor M. Blair, Kaitlin E. White admitted to this court . (ab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/20 10:18 AM
COMPLAINT against Contempora, Inc, Stacy Haynes-Nelson, Kamaria Nelson-Johnson (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4282901), filed by Latara Sturgis.(ab)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Nelson-Johnson Wedding Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Gallery Security Concern Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit Wedding Gallery,
Att: 4 Exhibit TN Tribune Article,
Att: 5 Exhibit TN Tribune Letter,
Att: 6 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet