MCPEEK v. WALMART INC
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | T Kent Wetherell II |
Referred: | Michael J Frank |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00074 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 5:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
WALMART INC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSEPH MCPEEK
12209 HUTCHISON BOULEVARD
PANAMA CITY BEACH, FL 32407 |
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER re 10 MOTION to Compel. If Plaintiff desires to prosecute this action, on or before 5/12/2025 , Plaintiff must file a notice with this court declaring his continued interest in this case. On or before 5/12/2025 , Plaintiff shall provide this court with a current mailing address. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 4/28/2025. (jcw) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 04/28 8:55 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re:10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay This Proceeding . Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) |
||
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay This Proceeding by WALMART INC. (KUEHNEL, SARAH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable: RETURN TO SENDER NOT AT THIS ADDRESS. Re:6 ORDER SHORTENING RESPONSE PERIOD. (No forwarding address is available.) (jcw) |
|
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice to Pro Se Litigant JOSEPH MCPEEK (jcw) |
|
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER. Defendant's motion for extension of time (Doc. 5 ) is GRANTED, and Defendant has until April 24, 2025, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for further pretrial proceedings under Local Rule 72.2(E). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 04/08/25. (WALMART INC Answer due by 4/24/2025 .) (jfj) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 04/08 1:13 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re:7 Order. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for further pretrial proceedings under Local Rule 72.2(E). (jfj) |
||
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER SHORTENING RESPONSE PERIOD. This case is before the Court based on Defendant's motion for extension of time (Doc. 5 ). Plaintiff has 7 days from the date of this Order to respond to Defendant's motion for extension of time. Failure to respond will result in the motion being granted by default under Local Rule 7.1(H). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 03/27/25. (jfj) |
|
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by WALMART INC. (KUEHNEL, SARAH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, March 21, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 03/21 7:39 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (mb) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 03/21 7:47 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re:1 Notice of Removal (Pro se Plaintiff). (mb) |
||
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by MAJA VESELINOVIC on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (VESELINOVIC, MAJA) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Walmart, Inc.. (KUEHNEL, SARAH) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from Circuit Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Bay County, Florida, case number 2025-CA-000152. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9410856.), filed by Walmart, Inc.. (KUEHNEL, SARAH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |