Florida Northern District Court
Judge:T Kent Wetherell II
Referred: Michael J Frank
Case #: 5:25-cv-00074
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant
WALMART INC
Represented By
SARAH JEAN KUEHNEL
Ogletree Deakins Nash Etc Pc - Tampa Fl
contact info
MAJA VESELINOVIC
Ogletree Deakins Nash Etc - Miami Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH MCPEEK
12209 HUTCHISON BOULEVARD
PANAMA CITY BEACH, FL 32407


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/28 1:49 PM
ORDER re 10 MOTION to Compel. If Plaintiff desires to prosecute this action, on or before 5/12/2025 , Plaintiff must file a notice with this court declaring his continued interest in this case. On or before 5/12/2025 , Plaintiff shall provide this court with a current mailing address. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 4/28/2025. (jcw)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 04/28 8:55 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re:10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay This Proceeding . Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
10 10 motion Compel Thu 04/24 10:48 AM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay This Proceeding by WALMART INC. (KUEHNEL, SARAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Ashley O'Brien in Support of Motion to Compel,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-E
Monday, April 21, 2025
9 9 misc Mail Returned Mon 04/21 3:31 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable: RETURN TO SENDER NOT AT THIS ADDRESS. Re:6 ORDER SHORTENING RESPONSE PERIOD. (No forwarding address is available.) (jcw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Pro Se Wed 04/09 9:29 AM
Notice to Pro Se Litigant JOSEPH MCPEEK (jcw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/08 1:10 PM
ORDER. Defendant's motion for extension of time (Doc. 5 ) is GRANTED, and Defendant has until April 24, 2025, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for further pretrial proceedings under Local Rule 72.2(E). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 04/08/25. (WALMART INC Answer due by 4/24/2025 .) (jfj)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 04/08 1:13 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re:7 Order. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for further pretrial proceedings under Local Rule 72.2(E). (jfj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/27 11:20 AM
ORDER SHORTENING RESPONSE PERIOD. This case is before the Court based on Defendant's motion for extension of time (Doc. 5 ). Plaintiff has 7 days from the date of this Order to respond to Defendant's motion for extension of time. Failure to respond will result in the motion being granted by default under Local Rule 7.1(H). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 03/27/25. Related [+] (jfj)
Related: [-] sponse to motion due by 4/3/2025 .
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 03/26 4:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by WALMART INC. (KUEHNEL, SARAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 misc Docket Annotation Fri 03/21 7:39 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (mb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 03/21 7:47 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re:1 Notice of Removal (Pro se Plaintiff). (mb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/20 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MAJA VESELINOVIC on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (VESELINOVIC, MAJA)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 03/20 1:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Walmart, Inc.. (KUEHNEL, SARAH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 03/20 11:38 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from Circuit Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Bay County, Florida, case number 2025-CA-000152. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9410856.), filed by Walmart, Inc.. (KUEHNEL, SARAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Ohio Complaint to Compel Arbitration