Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Tilman E Self, III
Case #: 3:25-cv-00040
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025
Case in other court:Athens-Clarke County State of Georgia, MC-01-CV-CV-24-02104
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
SKAPS INDUSTRIES
Represented By
BILLIE B PRITCHARD
contact info
PETER J WOZNIAK
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL APPLEBY
750 GAINES SCHOOL RD #D62
ATHENS, GA 30605


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Fri 05/16 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by BILLIE B PRITCHARD on behalf of SKAPS INDUSTRIES(PRITCHARD, BILLIE)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 05/16 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PETER J WOZNIAK on behalf of SKAPS INDUSTRIES (WOZNIAK, PETER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint/Petition Wed 05/14 12:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT1 Notice of Removal, against SKAPS INDUSTRIES by MICHAEL APPLEBY (REID, TILDEN) Modified to add docket text, clarifying name of filing on 5/14/2025 (aen)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/14 12:19 PM
MOTION Substitute Party Defendant by MICHAEL APPLEBY filed by TILDEN ROBERT REID.(REID, TILDEN)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/14 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by TILDEN ROBERT REID on behalf of MICHAEL APPLEBY Attorney TILDEN ROBERT REID added to party MICHAEL APPLEBY(pty:pla)(REID, TILDEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 04/25 3:27 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6.1 [JOINT] by SKAPS INDUSTRIES (PRITCHARD, BILLIE)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/25 12:41 PM
MOTION JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6.1 by SKAPS INDUSTRIES filed by BILLIE B PRITCHARD.(PRITCHARD, BILLIE)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 04/25 3:09 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Document is not a motion but a Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. Document must be re-filed using correct event which is Civil / Other Filings / Other Documents / Stipulation. (aen)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by SKAPS INDUSTRIES
Friday, March 21, 2025
7 7 misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Fri 03/21 3:39 PM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by PETER J WOZNIAK. (aen)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/21 3:31 PM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of SKAPS INDUSTRIES Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4899620, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Billie Pritchard, Bar No. 460789.(WOZNIAK, PETER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
5 5 misc Stipulation Fri 03/21 3:12 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6.1 (JOINT) by SKAPS INDUSTRIES (PRITCHARD, BILLIE)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/21 1:30 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SKAPS INDUSTRIES identifying Other Affiliate Matrix Composites for SKAPS INDUSTRIES. (PRITCHARD, BILLIE)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 03/21 8:31 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+], attention Counsel PETER J WOZNIAK : Your application for admission is rejected because you did not file your petition to plead and practice on PACER. Petition for Pro Hac Vice Admission may not be filed under another attorney's PACER login; pro hac vice counsel must use their own login credentials and password. From the PACER homepage, select Manage My Account at the top of the page > Log in > select the Maintenance tab > click the link that says Attorney Admissions/E-file Registration. Complete the E-File Registration Only request. If you already have e-filing privileges in our district, you can skip this step. Once your E-Filing privileges are granted, you will file your PHV Petition for Admission and Certificate of Good Standing in the case. Go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice. Upload your completed PHV Petition as the main document. Upload your Certificate of Good Standing as an attachment. Choose Certificate of Good Standing from the Category drop-down menu. You will be required to pay the $100 PHV fee at the time of filing. Once this has been successfully completed, a refund request will be sent to the finance department of any extra PHV fees paid. For more information, visit: https://www.gamd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions.(aen)
Related: [-] 3 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice filed by SKAPS INDUSTRIES
Thursday, March 20, 2025
3 3 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/20 6:12 PM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of SKAPS INDUSTRIES Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4898631, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Bille Pritchard.(PRITCHARD, BILLIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Payment Confirmation
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 03/20 5:53 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BILLIE B PRITCHARD on behalf of SKAPS INDUSTRIES (PRITCHARD, BILLIE)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 03/20 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL against SKAPS INDUSTRIES Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4898128, $405 filed by SKAPS INDUSTRIES All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case. (PRITCHARD, BILLIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Affidavit Wozniak Affidavit,
Att: 3 A - Appleby [STATE] Complaint in Athens-Clarke County,
Att: 4 B - Email from Wozniak to Appleby (3-6-25)
notice Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement Thu 03/20 3:29 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PETER J WOZNIAK - Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements .(aen)
Related: [-]