New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jeannette A Vargas
Case #: 1:25-mc-00117
CauseM 18-302 Registration of Foreign Judgment
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
order Writ of Execution Issued Wed 04/16 10:16 AM
Writ of Execution Issued on 4/16/2025. Judgment in favor of Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Solutions Inc., Karman Intermediate Corp., Karman Topco L.P. against Petruss Media Group, LLC f/k/a Take 5 Media Group LLC, RJV Marketing Corp., Alexander Radetich, Richard Gluck in the amount of $ 74,816,853.37. (Signed by Clerk of Court Tammi M Hellwig on 04/16/2025).(nd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 04/15 9:55 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alan Asher Greenberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Petruss Media Group, LLC,RJV Marketing Corp., Alexander Radetich, Richard Gluck, Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Karman Intermediate Corp., Advantage Solutions Inc., Karman Topco L.P.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vba)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Miscellaneous Pleading Mon 04/14 5:11 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT MISCELLANEOUS PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alan Asher Greenberg re: Document No. 1 Registration of Foreign Judgment,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Docket the event type Add Party for Pleading found under the event list Miscellaneous Case Initiating Documents. (vba)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Mon 04/14 7:26 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING (MISCELLANEOUS CASE) Defendants/Respondents Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Karman Intermediate Corp., Advantage Solutions Inc. and Karman Topco L.P. added. Party added pursuant to1 Registration of Foreign Judgment,,,. Document filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC.(Greenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Mon 04/14 7:31 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING (MISCELLANEOUS CASE) Plaintiffs/Petitioners RJV Marketing Corp., Alexander Radetich and Richard Gluck added. Party added pursuant to1 Registration of Foreign Judgment,,,. Document filed by Karman Intermediate Corp., Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Advantage Solutions Inc., Karman Topco L.P..(Greenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 03/26 10:00 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alan Asher Greenberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Petruss Media Group, LLC, Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Advantage Solutions Inc., Richard Gluck, Karman Intermediate Corp., Karman Topco L.P., RJV Marketing Corp., Alexander Radetich. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias party type was entered incorrectly; party not listed on main pleading. (laq)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 03/26 10:02 AM
Case Designated ECF. (laq)
Related: [-]
notice Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 03/26 10:15 AM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . .(laq)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Request an Abstract of Judgment Wed 03/26 10:20 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO REQUEST AN ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. Notice to Attorney Alan Asher Greenberg regarding 1 Registration of Foreign Judgment,,,. A REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT FROM UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT has been received by the Court. No further action is required by the Clerk's office at this time. Please see ECF Filing Rules & Instructions 16.6 on how to request an Abstract of Judgment. (laq)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
1 1 misccs Registration of Foreign Judgment Thu 03/20 2:03 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT FROM UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT Judgment in favor of Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Solutions Inc., Karman Intermediate Corp., Karman Topco L.P. against Petruss Media Group, LLC f/k/a Take 5 Media Group LLC, RJV Marketing Corp., Alexander Radetich, Richard Gluck in the amount of $ 74,816,853.37. Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Columbia. Other Court Case Number: 22-3278 (RC). (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30800043)Document filed by Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Solutions Inc., Karman Intermediate Corp., Karman Topco L.P..(Greenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Judgment,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Miscellaneous Case Cover Sheet