California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:25-cv-02461
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025
Case in other court:Ventura Superior Court, 2025CUWT039251
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 2:30 AM PDT
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By
Paul Berkowitz
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Michaela R Goldstein
Sheppard Mullin
contact info
Plaintiff
Carmen De Acros-Gonzalez
Represented By
Michael J Freiman
Law Office Of Michael Freiman
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
11 11 misc Report Tue 05/06 3:39 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) REPORT filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Berkowitz, Paul)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/06 3:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court issued an order requiring the parties to submit a Joint Rule 26(f) Report at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference. (Order Setting Scheduling Conference§ I, ECF No. 9.) To date, no report has been filed. The Court continues the Scheduling Conference to June 2, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. The parties are ordered to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference. The parties shall respond in writing by no later than May 19, 2025. In lieu of filing a response, the order to show cause will discharge upon the filing of a Joint Rule 26(f) Report. See document for details. (smo)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 03/24 9:52 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/24 9:50 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/21 5:16 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/21 5:16 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/21 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/20 11:45 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank identifying Wells Fargo & Company as Corporate Parent. (Berkowitz, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/20 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, identifying Wells Fargo & Company. (Berkowitz, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/20 11:43 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank. (Berkowitz, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/20 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura, case number 2025CUWT039251 Receipt No: ACACDC-39341729 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank. (Attorney Paul Berkowitz added to party Wells Fargo Bank(pty:dft))(Berkowitz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Answer,
Att: 4 Declaration Proof of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 03/21 11:56 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Carmen De Acros-Gonzalez in Ventura Superior Court on 2/26/2025, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 03/21 11:59 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Ventura Superior Court on 3/19/2025, attached as Exhibit C. (jtil)
Related: [-]