Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:25-bk-30282
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Apr 14, 2025

TypePartnership
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Peppermill Limited Partnership 1
PO Box 2345
Monroe, LA 71207-2345
Represented By
Wade N. Kelly
Packard Lapray
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
DIP
U.S. Trustee
Office of U. S. Trustee
300 Fannin St., Suite 3196
Shreveport, LA 71101
Represented By
Antony Constantini
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
98 98 misc Exhibit List Thu 05/22 3:33 PM
Exhibits/Witness List introduced in open court. Related [+] Witness: Summer Davidson, Property Accountant. (melo)
Related: [-] 28 Plaintiff Belton Pro Se's Objection to Debtor in Possession Bankruptcy, Motion for Removal, and Consolidation to the Federal Court.,30 Expedited Motion For Delivery of Accounting Pursuant to 11 USC 543(a) and (b),36 Belton Pro Se Creditor's Motion to Object, Assert Rights, and Renew Notice and Motion for Removal and Consolidation,43 Motion to Stay and Supplemental Objection,44 Motion to Compel Proper Service and Notice to Interested Creditors,47 Motion to Compel Debtor in Possession to Respond to Supplemental Objection and Enforce Order Prior to May 21, 2025 Hearing,66 Motion for Order to Provide for Application of Part VII Rules to Contested Matter Pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014(c),70 Expedited Motion For Delivery of An Accounting Pursuant to 11 U. S. C. 543 (a) and (b),75 Motion to Stay and Supplemental Objection to Debtor in Possession Status,80 Motion to Compel Proper Service and Notice to Interested Creditors,85 Motion to Compel Debtor in Possession to Respond to Supplemental Objection and Enforce Order Prior to May 21, 2025 Hearing
court Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re: (SHV/LAF) Thu 05/22 3:01 PM
1st CONT'D - Evidentiary Hearing - Minute Entry Re: Related [+] . APPEARANCES IN PERSON: Wade Kelly for Debtors, Mack Frank, Investigatore/Advisor for Will J. Belton, Will Belton - Creditor, Summer Davidson - Property Accountant. Testimony Adduced. Witness - Summery Davidson, Property Accountant. RULING: Expedited Motion For Delivery of Accounting Pursuant to 11 USC 543(a) and (b) Hearing continued to 06/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Order- NA. (melo)
Related: [-] 30 Expedited Motion For Delivery of Accounting Pursuant to 11 USC 543(a) and (b)
court Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re: (SHV/LAF) Thu 05/22 3:03 PM
1st CONT'D - Evidentiary Hearing - Minute Entry Re: Related [+]. APPEARANCES IN PERSON: Wade Kelly for Debtors, Mack Frank, Investigatore/Advisor for Will J. Belton, Will Belton - Creditor, Summer Davidson - Property Accountant. Testimony Adduced. Witness - Summery Davidson, Property Accountant. RULING: Belton Pro Se Creditor's Motion to Object, Assert Rights, and Renew Notice and Motion for Removal and Consolidation Hearing continued to 06/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Order - NA. (melo)
Related: [-] 36 Belton Pro Se Creditor's Motion to Object, Assert Rights, and Renew Notice and Motion for Removal and Consolidation
court Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re: (SHV/LAF) Thu 05/22 3:04 PM
1st CONT'D - Evidentiary Hearing - Minute Entry Re: Related [+]. APPEARANCES IN PERSON: Wade Kelly for Debtors, Mack Frank, Investigator/Advisor for Will J. Belton, Will Belton - Creditor, Summer Davidson - Property Accountant. Testimony Adduced. Witness - Summery Davidson, Property Accountant. RULING: Plaintiff Belton Pro Se's Objection to Debtor in Possession Bankruptcy, Motion for Removal, and Consolidation to the Federal Court Hearing continued to 06/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Order - NA. (melo)
Related: [-] 28 Plaintiff Belton Pro Se's Objection to Debtor in Possession Bankruptcy, Motion for Removal, and Consolidation to the Federal Court
court Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re: (SHV/LAF) Thu 05/22 3:06 PM
1st CONT'D - Hearing - Minute Entry Re: Related [+]. APPEARANCES IN PERSON: Wade Kelly for Debtors, Mack Frank, Investigator/Advisor for Will J. Belton, Will Belton - Creditor, Summer Davidson - Property Accountant. Testimony Adduced. Witness - Summery Davidson, Property Accountant. RULING: Motion to Stay and Supplemental Objection Hearing continued to 06/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Order - NA. (melo)
Related: [-] 43 Motion to Stay and Supplemental Objection
court Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re: (SHV/LAF) Thu 05/22 3:08 PM
1st CONT'D - Evidentiary Hearing - Minute Entry Re: Related [+]. APPEARANCES IN PERSON: Wade Kelly for Debtors, Mack Frank, Investigator/Advisor for Will J. Belton, Will Belton - Creditor, Summer Davidson - Property Accountant. Testimony Adduced. Witness - Summery Davidson, Property Accountant. RULING: Motion to Compel Proper Service and Notice to Interested Creditors Hearing continued to 06/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Order - NA. (melo)
Related: [-] 44 Motion to Compel Proper Service and Notice to Interested Creditors
court Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re: (SHV/LAF) Thu 05/22 3:09 PM
1st CONT'D - Evidentiary Hearing - Minute Entry Re: Related [+]. APPEARANCES IN PERSON: Wade Kelly for Debtors, Mack Frank, Investigator/Advisor for Will J. Belton, Will Belton - Creditor, Summer Davidson - Property Accountant. Testimony Adduced. Witness - Summery Davidson, Property Accountant. RULING: Motion to Compel Debtor in Possession to Respond to Supplemental Objection and Enforce Order Prior to May 21, 2025 Hearing Hearing continued to 06/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Order - NA. (melo)
Related: [-] 47 Motion to Compel Debtor in Possession to Respond to Supplemental Objection and Enforce Order Prior to May 21, 2025 Hearing
court Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re: (SHV/LAF) Thu 05/22 3:12 PM
1st CONT'D - Evidentiary Hearing - Minute Entry Re: Related [+]. APPEARANCES IN PERSON: Wade Kelly for Debtors, Mack Frank, Investigator/Advisor for Will J. Belton, Will Belton - Creditor, Summer Davidson - Property Accountant. Testimony Adduced. Witness - Summery Davidson, Property Accountant. RULING: Motion for Order to Provide for Application of Part VII Rules to Contested Matter Pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014(c) Hearing continued to 06/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Order - NA. (melo)
Related: [-] 66 Motion for Order to Provide for Application of Part VII Rules to Contested Matter Pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014(c)
court Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re: (SHV/LAF) Thu 05/22 3:14 PM
1st CONT'D - Evidentiary Hearing - Minute Entry Re: Related [+]. APPEARANCES IN PERSON: Wade Kelly for Debtors, Mack Frank, Investigator/Advisor for Will J. Belton, Will Belton - Creditor, Summer Davidson - Property Accountant. Testimony Adduced. Witness - Summery Davidson, Property Accountant. RULING: Expedited Motion For Delivery of An Accounting Pursuant to 11 U. S. C. 543 (a) and (b) Hearing continued to 06/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Order - NA. (melo)
Related: [-] 70 Expedited Motion For Delivery of An Accounting Pursuant to 11 U. S. C. 543 (a) and (b)
court Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re: (SHV/LAF) Thu 05/22 3:16 PM
1st CONT'D - Evidentiary Hearing - Minute Entry Re: Related [+]. APPEARANCES IN PERSON: Wade Kelly for Debtors, Mack Frank, Investigator/Advisor for Will J. Belton, Will Belton - Creditor, Summer Davidson - Property Accountant. Testimony Adduced. Witness - Summery Davidson, Property Accountant. RULING: Motion to Stay and Supplemental Objection to Debtor in Possession Status Hearing continued to 06/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Order - NA. (melo)
Related: [-] 75 Motion to Stay and Supplemental Objection to Debtor in Possession Status
court Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re: (SHV/LAF) Thu 05/22 3:21 PM
1st CONT'D - Evidentiary Hearing - Minute Entry Re: Related [+]. . APPEARANCES IN PERSON: Wade Kelly for Debtors, Mack Frank, Investigator/Advisor for Will J. Belton, Will Belton - Creditor, Summer Davidson - Property Accountant. Testimony Adduced. Witness - Summery Davidson, Property Accountant. RULING: Motion to Compel Proper Service and Notice to Interested Creditors Hearing continued to 06/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Order - NA. (melo)
Related: [-] 80 Motion to Compel Proper Service and Notice to Interested Creditors
court Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re: (SHV/LAF) Thu 05/22 3:22 PM
1st CONT'D - Evidentiary Hearing - Minute Entry Re: Related [+]. APPEARANCES IN PERSON: Wade Kelly for Debtors, Mack Frank, Investigator/Advisor for Will J. Belton, Will Belton - Creditor, Summer Davidson - Property Accountant. Testimony Adduced. Witness - Summery Davidson, Property Accountant. RULING: Motion to Compel Debtor in Possession to Respond to Supplemental Objection and Enforce Order Prior to May 21, 2025 Hearing continued to 06/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Order - NA. (melo)
Related: [-] 85 Motion to Compel Debtor in Possession to Respond to Supplemental Objection and Enforce Order Prior to May 21, 2025 Hearing
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
97 97 answer Response Tue 05/20 9:59 AM
Response to Related [+] Debtor's Allegation Regarding Accounting with Certificate of Service . Filed by Edward H. Arnold III of Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) (Arnold, Edward)
Related: [-] 65 Motion to Expedite Hearing
Saturday, May 17, 2025
96 96 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/17 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 69 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing
Friday, May 16, 2025
95 95 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/16 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 61 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
94 94 answer Reply Fri 05/16 2:02 PM
Reply to Debtor-In-Possession Response to Fannie Mae Accounting Order and Objection to Fraudulent Transfer and Illegal Management Access Related [+] with Certificate of Service . Filed by Will J. Belton. CLERK'S ENTRY - MISSING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE OF FILER. CREDITOR TO REFILE WITH SIGNATURES. (melo)
Related: [-] 34 Objection
93 93 answer Objection Fri 05/16 1:57 PM
Motion to Strike or Oppose Debtor's Motion for Order to Apply FRBP 9014(c) and for Sanctions or Stay of Proceedings Related [+] with Certificate of Service Filed by Will J. Belton. (melo)
Related: [-] 66 Motion for Order to Provide for Application of Part VII Rules to Contested Matter Pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014(c)
92 92 motion Miscellaneous Motion (Generic) Fri 05/16 1:42 PM
Notice of Will J. Belton in Proper Person Order for Zoom Video Hearing May 21, 2025 and Incorporate Motion to Comple Proper Service and Notice to Interested Parties with Certificate of Service Filed by Will J. Belton. Related [+] (melo)
Related: [-] filed Notice/Motion
Thursday, May 15, 2025
91 91 motion Miscellaneous Motion (Generic) Thu 05/15 3:10 PM
Notice of Will J. Belton in Proper Person Order for Zoom Video Hearing May 21, 2025 and Incorporate Motion to Comple Proper Service and Notice to Interested Parties with Certificate of Service Filed by Will J. Belton. CLERK'S ENTRY - MISSING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE OF FILER. CREDITOR TO REFILE WITH SIGNATURES. (melo)
Related: [-]
90 90 motion Stay Thu 05/15 3:00 PM
Judicial Notice and Motion To Stay Pending Withdraw Bankruptcy Proceedings in US District Court, Middle District of Louisiana with Certificate of Service Filed by Will J. Belton. (melo)
Related: [-]
89 89 answer Reply Thu 05/15 2:52 PM
Reply to The Debtor's Response to Belton Pro Se Creditor Motion to Object, Assert Rights, and Renew Notice and Motion for Withdrawal and Removal and Consolidation Related [+] with Certificate of Service . Filed by Will J. Belton (melo)
Related: [-] 56 Response
Att: 1 Exhibit A part 1
Att: 2 Exhibit A part 2
Att: 3 Exhibit A part 3
Att: 4 Exhibit B
Att: 5 Exhibit C
Att: 6 Exhibit D
88 88 answer Response Thu 05/15 2:29 PM
Belton Pro Se Reply to Fannie Mae's Objection to Motion to Withdraw and Consolidate and Supporting Order Related [+] with Certificate of Service . Filed by Will J. Belton. (melo)
Related: [-] 60 Response
87 87 answer Response Thu 05/15 2:16 PM
Response to Related [+] Joinder to Debtor's Response to Belton's Supplemental Objection to Debtor in Possession Status and Motion to Stay with Certificate of Service . Filed by Carli Marcello Worsham of Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae). ORIGINALLY FILED 5/13/2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #55. (melo)
Related: [-] 86 Response
86 86 answer Response Thu 05/15 2:15 PM
Response to Related [+]. Filed by Wade N. Kelly of Packard LaPray on behalf of Pecan Acres Limited Partnership 1. ORIGINALLY FILED 5/12/2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #52. (melo)
Related: [-] 85 Motion to Compel Debtor in Possession to Respond to Supplemental Objection and Enforce Order Prior to May 21, 2025 Hearing
85 85 motion Compel Thu 05/15 2:09 PM
Motion to Compel Debtor in Possession to Respond to Supplemental Objection and Enforce Order Prior to May 21, 2025 Hearing Filed by Will J. Belton. ORIGINALLY FILED 4/25/2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #48. (melo)
Related: [-]
84 84 answer Response Thu 05/15 2:06 PM
Response to Related [+] Joinder to Debtor's Response to Belton's Supplemental Objection to Debtor in Possession Status and Motion to Stay with Certificate of Service . Filed by Katie L. Dysart of Baker Donnelson on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae). ORIGINALLY FILED 5 13-2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #55. (melo)
Related: [-] 83 Response
83 83 answer Response Thu 05/15 2:05 PM
Response to Related [+] with Certificate of Service . Filed by Wade N. Kelly of Packard LaPray on behalf of Pecan Acres Limited Partnership 1. ORIGINALLY FILED 5/12/2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #52. (melo)
Related: [-] 80 Motion to Compel Proper Service and Notice to Interested Creditors
82 82 notice Notice Re: Thu 05/15 2:03 PM
Notice of Will J. Belton in Proper Person and Creditor Motion to Compel and DIP to Respond to Supplemental Objection and Enforce Order Prior to May 21, 2025 and Response Deadline and Request-Motion to Attend Hearing Remotely Related [+] Filed by Will J. Belton. ORIGINALLY FILED 4 25-2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #49. (melo)
Related: [-] 80 Motion to Compel Proper Service and Notice to Interested Creditors
81 81 notice Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing) Thu 05/15 2:01 PM
Notice of Hearing (Served) on Re: (80 Motion to Compel Proper Service and Notice to Interested Creditors). Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Filed by Will J. Belton. ORIGINALLY FILED 4 17-2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #46. (melo)
Related: [-]
80 80 motion Miscellaneous Motion (Generic) Thu 05/15 1:59 PM
Motion to Compel Proper Service and Notice to Interested Creditors with Certificate of Service Filed by Will J. Belton. ORIGINALLY FILED 4 17-2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #45. (melo)
Related: [-]
79 79 answer Response Thu 05/15 1:56 PM
Response to Related [+] Joinder to Debtor's Response to Belton's Supplemental Objection to Debtor in Possession Status and Motion to Stay with Certificate of Service. Filed by Katie L. Dysart of Baker Donnelson on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae). ORIGINALLY FILED 5/13/2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #55. (melo)
Related: [-] 78 Response
78 78 answer Response Thu 05/15 1:54 PM
Response to Related [+] with Certificate of Service . Filed by Wade N. Kelly of Packard LaPray on behalf of Pecan Acres Limited Partnership 1. ORIGINALLY FILED 5/12/2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #52. (melo)
Related: [-] 75 Motion to Stay and Supplemental Objection to Debtor in Possession Status
77 77 notice Notice Re: Thu 05/15 1:52 PM
Notice of Will J. Belton in Proper Person and Creditor Motion to Compel and DIP to Respond to Supplemental Objection and Enforce Order Prior to May 21, 2025 and Response Deadline and Request-Motion to Attend Hearing Remotely Related [+] with Certificate of Service Filed by Will J. Belton (melo). ORIGINALLY FILED 4/25/2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #49. (melo)
Related: [-] 44 Objection, 45 Motion to Compel
76 76 notice Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing) Thu 05/15 1:49 PM
Notice of Hearing (Served) on Re: (75 Motion to Stay and Supplemental Objection to Debtor in Possession Status) with Certificate of Service . Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. Filed by Will J. Belton. ORIGINALLY FILED 4 17-2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #46. (melo)
Related: [-]
75 75 motion Miscellaneous Motion (Generic) Thu 05/15 1:45 PM
Motion to Stay and Supplemental Objection to Debtor in Possession Status Related [+] with Certificate of Service Filed by Will J. Belton (melo) Filed by Will J. Belton. ORIGINALLY FILED 4 17-2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #44. (melo)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11
74 74 4 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 05/15 1:34 PM
Interim Order Setting Final Hearing Related [+] Final Hearing is set for 5/21/2025 @ 10:30 am in United States Bankruptcy Court, 2nd Floor, 611 Broad Street, Lake Charles, Louisiana. Filed on 3/21/2025 (melo).. ORIGINALLY FILED 3 21-2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #39. Filed on 5/15/2025 (melo)
Related: [-] 5 Expedited Motion For Delivery of An Accounting Pursuant to 11 U. S. C. 543 (a) and (b)
73 73 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/15 1:28 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Katie L. Dysart on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae). ORIGINALLY FILED 3 19-2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #34. (melo)
Related: [-] 72 Certificate of Service
72 72 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/15 1:27 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Katie L. Dysart on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae). CLERK'S ENTRY - MAILING MATRIX NOT ATTACHED. ATTORNEY TO FILE AS SUPPORT DOCUMENT. Modified on 3/19/2025 (katc). ORIGINALLY FILED 3 19-2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #33. (melo)
Related: [-] 71 Objection
71 71 answer Objection Thu 05/15 1:25 PM
Objection to Related [+] Filed by Katie L. Dysart of Baker Donnelson on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae). ORIGINALLY FILED 3/18/2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #32. (melo)
Related: [-] 70 Expedited Motion For Delivery of An Accounting Pursuant to 11 U. S. C. 543 (a) and (b)
70 70 motion Miscellaneous Motion (Generic) Thu 05/15 1:23 PM
Expedited Motion For Delivery of An Accounting Pursuant to 11 U. S. C. 543 (a) and (b) with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of Pecan Acres Limited Partnership 1. ORIGINALLY FILED 3/11/2025 IN 25-20112 DOCUMENT #5. (melo)
Related: [-]
69 69 order Expedite Hearing Thu 05/15 11:48 AM
Order Granting Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. (melo)
Related: [-] 67 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Debtor Peppermill Limited Partnership 1, Debtor Pecan Acres Limited Partnership 166 Motion for Order to Provide for Application of Part VII Rules to Contested Matter Pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014(c) filed by Debtor Peppermill Limited Partnership 1, Debtor Pecan Acres Limited Partnership 1,
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
68 68 answer Response Wed 05/14 4:03 PM
Response to Related [+] Response Reflecting that Order to Provide Accounting and Related Matters is Insufficient with Certificate of Service . Filed by Wade N. Kelly of Packard LaPray on behalf of Pecan Acres Limited Partnership 1, Peppermill Limited Partnership 1 (Kelly, Wade)
Related: [-] 38 Order to Set Hearing
Att: 1 Exhibit Payments by Pecan Acres Limited Partnership 1
Att: 2 Exhibit Payments by Peppermill Limited Partnership 1
67 67 motion Expedite Hearing Wed 05/14 2:41 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of Pecan Acres Limited Partnership 1, Peppermill Limited Partnership 1 (Kelly, Wade)
Related: [-] 66 Miscellaneous Motion
66 66 motion Miscellaneous Motion (Generic) Wed 05/14 2:40 PM
Motion for Order to Provide for Application of Part VII Rules to Contested Matter Pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014(c) with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of Pecan Acres Limited Partnership 1, Peppermill Limited Partnership 1 (Kelly, Wade)
Related: [-]
65 65 motion Expedite Hearing Wed 05/14 1:30 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] for Contested Matter Related to Accounting with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of Pecan Acres Limited Partnership 1 (Kelly, Wade)
Related: [-] 64 Miscellaneous Motion
64 64 motion Miscellaneous Motion (Generic) Wed 05/14 1:25 PM
Expedited Motion for Order to Provide for Application of Part VII of FRBP 9014(c) in contested matter with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of Pecan Acres Limited Partnership 1 (Kelly, Wade)
Related: [-]
63 63 motion Expedite Hearing Wed 05/14 12:50 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of Peppermill Limited Partnership 1 (Kelly, Wade)
Related: [-] 62 Miscellaneous Motion
62 62 motion Miscellaneous Motion (Generic) Wed 05/14 12:49 PM
Expedited Motion for Order to Provide for Application of Part VII of FRBP 9014(c) to Contested Matter with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of Peppermill Limited Partnership 1 (Kelly, Wade)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party Wed 05/14 10:33 AM
Pecan Acres Limited Partnership 1 added to case (char)
Related: [-]