52
|
|
52
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Sat 05/03 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/02/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
|
51
|
|
51
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Sat 05/03 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/02/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
|
50
|
|
50
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Fri 05/02 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/01/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
|
49
|
|
49
audio
Wed 04/30 3:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [04/30/2025 02:00:21 PM]. File Size [ 4729 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:10:04 ]. (11(a) Status Conference). (admin)
Related: [-]
|
48
|
|
48
order
Regarding Status Conference
Wed 04/30 2:18 PM
Order Regarding Status Conference Related [+]. (Angel, Sharon)
|
47
|
|
47
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/30 9:40 AM
Certificate of Service filed by George M. Oliver on behalf of Three Star Trucking, LLC Related [+]. (Oliver, George)
|
46
|
|
46
order
File Plan & Setting Status Conf. (SubChapter V)
Wed 04/30 8:04 AM
Amended Order to File Plan and Notice of Status Conference (SubChapter V) Chapter 11 Plan due by 6/18/2025. Status hearing to be held on 4/30/2025 at 02:00 PM at Telephone Conference/Judge Callaway. (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]
|
45
|
|
45
order
Interim Order
Tue 04/29 3:29 PM
Interim Consent Order Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2025 at 01:00 PM at Greenville Courtroom (New) Certificate of Service due 5/5/2025. Related [+]. (Wiggins, Carrie)
|
44
|
|
44
order
Approve Officer Compensation
Tue 04/29 9:27 AM
Order Granting Application for Approval of Officer Compensation Related [+] (Wiggins, Carrie)
|
43
|
|
43
order
Appear for Examination
Tue 04/29 7:52 AM
Order to Appear for Examination (Charles L. Stokes, Jr.) . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Matter Removed from Calendar
Tue 04/29 3:05 PM
Matter Removed from Calendar Prior to Hearing Interim Cash Collateral continued to 6/3/25 at 1:00 PM in Greenville Related [+] (Angel, Sharon)
|
|
|
utility
Calendar - Add
Tue 04/29 3:30 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Add to Calendar 6/3/2025 Related [+] (Wiggins, Carrie)
|
42
|
|
42
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 04/26 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/25/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
|
41
|
|
41
misc
Withdrawal of Document
Fri 04/25 8:41 AM
Withdrawal of Document filed by Kirstin E. Gardner on behalf of Bankruptcy Administrator Related [+]. (Gardner, Kirstin)
|
|
|
utility
Matter Removed from Calendar
Fri 04/25 9:26 AM
Matter Removed from Calendar Prior to Hearing Response Withdrawn Related [+] (Angel, Sharon)
|