Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:25-cv-00502
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 4:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Profoto Aktiebolag
Represented By
Jeremy E Roller
Arete Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Godox Photo Equipment Co Ltd
Represented By
Ziyong Li
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff Llp (sf)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
15 15 4 pgs misc Joint Status Report Mon 05/12 8:58 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5. (Li, Ziyong)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
14 14 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 05/09 2:44 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Profoto Aktiebolag on 5/9/2025, filed by Plaintiff Godox Photo Equipment Co Ltd. (Li, Ziyong)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
13 13 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Order on Motion for Leave Thu 05/08 8:04 PM
ORDER DENYING without prejudice7 Godox's motion for temporary restraining order, and request for expedited discovery and order to show cause and GRANTING7 motion for alternative service and12 motion for leave to supplement alternative service email addresses. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson.(BTD)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Leave Thu 05/08 11:20 AM
MOTION for Leave to Supplement Alternative Service Email Addresses , filed by Plaintiff Godox Photo Equipment Co Ltd. Noting Date 5/8/2025, (Li, Ziyong)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
11 11 respm Response to Motion Wed 05/07 9:00 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant Profoto Aktiebolag, to7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Alternative Service, Expedited Discovery, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue . Oral Argument Requested. (Roller, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Wed 05/07 9:30 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/28/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/11/2025, Joint Status Report due by 6/18/2025. (DS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
9 9 3 pgs notice Notice-Other Tue 05/06 7:06 PM
NOTICE of Intent to Oppose re7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Alternative Service, Expedited Discovery, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue ; filed by Defendant Profoto Aktiebolag. (Roller, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 7:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeremy E Roller on behalf of Defendant Profoto Aktiebolag. (Roller, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
7 7 31 pgs motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 05/05 1:15 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Alternative Service, Expedited Discovery, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue , filed by Plaintiff Godox Photo Equipment Co Ltd. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 5/5/2025, (Li, Ziyong)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ziyong Li,
Att: 2 Declaration of Wenfeng He,
Att: 3 Declaration of Yunmei Jin,
Att: 4 Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit C,
Att: 7 Exhibit D,
Att: 8 Exhibit E,
Att: 9 Exhibit F,
Att: 10 Exhibit G,
Att: 11 Exhibit H,
Att: 12 Exhibit I,
Att: 13 Exhibit J,
Att: 14 Exhibit K,
Att: 15 Exhibit L,
Att: 16 Exhibit M,
Att: 17 Exhibit N,
Att: 18 Exhibit O,
Att: 19 Exhibit P,
Att: 20 Exhibit Q,
Att: 21 Exhibit R,
Att: 22 Exhibit S,
Att: 23 Exhibit T,
Att: 24 Exhibit U,
Att: 25 Exhibit V,
Att: 26 Proposed Order
Monday, March 24, 2025
6 6 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Mon 03/24 2:40 PM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
5 5 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Mon 03/24 2:39 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 03/21 1:32 PM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Profoto Aktiebolag. (RE)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Fri 03/21 1:30 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (RE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 03/21 1:22 PM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (RE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
2 2 2 pgs discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 03/20 3:18 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Godox Photo Equipment Co., Ltd.. (Li, Ziyong)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/20 3:15 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against defendant(s) Profoto Aktiebolag with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Ziyong Li added to party Godox Photo Equipment Co., Ltd.(pty:pla) filed by Godox Photo Equipment Co., Ltd..(Li, Ziyong)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8892873
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 17 pgs Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 11,630,375,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Article from WA Journal of Law,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit 3 - Executed Agreement,
Att: 5 4 pgs Exhibit 4 - Executed Agreement,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120)