New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:25-mc-00118
CauseM 08-85 Motion to Quash
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
5 5 order Order Wed 04/23 4:32 PM
ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report on or before May 22, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken) (Text Only Order) (djh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
4 4 misc Status Report Tue 04/22 7:26 PM
STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report re ECF 3 Document filed by Paul Tremblay..(Hydal, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
3 3 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Case Stayed Thu 03/27 9:26 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAY, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties, through their undersigned counsel and subject to the Court's approval, that: 1. This proceeding is hereby STAYED; 2. The Parties shall file a joint status report on or before April 22, 2025, to inform the Court as to whether the Parties are able to reach a resolution or if the proceedings should be reinstated; SO ORDERED. (Case stayed.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/26/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 03/26 4:47 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Paul Tremblay..(Hydal, Christopher)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Removal of Party Wed 03/26 11:39 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Christopher James Hydal. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: TA-NEHISI COATES, ANDREW SEAN GREER, Christopher Golden, DAVID HENRY HWANG, Diaz Junot, MATTHEW KLAM, Richard Kadrey, Laura Lippman, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I, L.P.,OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC, RACHEL LOUISE SNYDER, Sarah Silverman, JACQUELINE WOODSON. The party was added to the case in error. (laq)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 03/26 12:24 PM
Case Designated ECF. (laq)
Related: [-]
notice Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 03/26 12:36 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . .(laq)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
1 1 19 pgs motion Quash Thu 03/20 11:58 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash Tremblay . Other Court Name: United States District Court - Northern District of California. Other Court Case Number: 3:23-cv-03223-AMO. (Filing Fee $ 52.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30803850)Document filed by TA-NEHISI COATES, ANDREW SEAN GREER, Christopher Golden, DAVID HENRY HWANG, Diaz Junot, MATTHEW KLAM, Richard Kadrey, Laura Lippman, RACHEL LOUISE SNYDER, Sarah Silverman, Paul Tremblay, JACQUELINE WOODSON.(Hydal, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Affidavit Tribble Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit EX A,
Att: 3 Exhibit EX B,
Att: 4 Exhibit EX C,
Att: 5 22 pgs Exhibit EX D,
Att: 6 Exhibit EX E,
Att: 7 Exhibit EX F,
Att: 8 Exhibit EX G,
Att: 9 Exhibit EX H,
Att: 10 Exhibit EX I,
Att: 11 Exhibit EX J,
Att: 12 Exhibit EX K,
Att: 13 Exhibit EX L,
Att: 14 Exhibit EX M,
Att: 15 Affidavit Sweatman Declaration,
Att: 16 Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 17 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet