Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00108
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 21, 2025 3:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Larry Dean Dusenbery (1)
Represented By
Edward G. Bryan
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Cleveland
contact info
Christian J. Grostic
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Yasmine T. Makridis
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Youngstown
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/21/2025 5:18 AM EDT
Thursday, February 20, 2025
1 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 2/20/2025. filed by USA as to Larry Dean Dusenbery (1). (P,G) [5:25-mj-01043-AMK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Friday, February 21, 2025
Arrest of Larry Dean Dusenbery on 2/21/2025. (P,G) [5:25-mj-01043-AMK]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Larry Dean Dusenbery. (P,G) [5:25-mj-01043-AMK]
Related: [-]
Order [non-document] Appointing Federal Public Defender Edward G. Bryan for Larry Dean Dusenbery. The Federal Public Defender must report to the Court any significant changes in defendant's employment or financial circumstances sufficient to enable defendant to pay, in whole or in part, for legal representation. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 2/21/2025. (P,G) [5:25-mj-01043-AMK]
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. Initial Appearance as to Larry Dean Dusenbery held on 2/21/2025. AUSA Chris Joyce present for Yasmine Makridis for the government. Attorney Edward Bryan present and appointed to represent defendant. Defendant present. Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court reminds the government of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), to disclose evidence favorable to the defendant and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment. The government is ordered to comply with Brady and its progeny. The failure to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including dismissal of the indictment or information, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, sanctions by the Court, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Defendant advised of charges. Defendant waives preliminary hearing; waiver executed. Court accepts waiver. Matter bound over to the Grand Jury for further proceedings. Government does not move for detention and concurs with bond recommendation of Pretrial Services. Bond set at $20,000 unsecured with standard/special conditions. (Court Reporter ECRO: K. Crawford) Time: 10 minutes. (P,G) [5:25-mj-01043-AMK]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Larry Dean Dusenbery. (P,G) [5:25-mj-01043-AMK]
Related: [-]
6 6 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Larry Dean Dusenbery. (P,G) [5:25-mj-01043-AMK]
Related: [-]
7 7 Appearance Bond Entered as to Larry Dean Dusenbery in amount of $ 20,000 unsecured. (P,G) [5:25-mj-01043-AMK]
Related: [-]
8 8 Order Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 2/21/2025. (P,G) [5:25-mj-01043-AMK]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 2/21/2025 in case as to Larry Dean Dusenbery. (P,G) [5:25-mj-01043-AMK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 Notice of Appearance of Attorney - Christian J. Grostic appearing for Larry Dean Dusenbery (1) Replacing Edward Bryan (Grostic, Christian) [5:25-mj-01043-AMK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
11 11 Indictment filed by USA as to Larry Dean Dusenbery (1) count(s) 1. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form and Signature Page