Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:25-cr-00488
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 21, 2025 2:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Susana Anguiano-Velasquez (1)
Represented By
Melissa Evelia Lopez
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Benjamin Storey Lyles
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/21/2025 4:34 AM CDT
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
Arrest of Susana Anguiano-Velasquez, filed. (mrg7) [7:25-mj-00363]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Susana Anguiano-Velasquez (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 2/26/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (mrg7) [7:25-mj-00363]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Susana Anguiano-Velasquez, filed. (mrg7). [7:25-mj-00363]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE, PRELIMINARY HEARING, AND DETENTION HEARING on Criminal Complaint as to Susana Anguiano-Velasquez held on 2/26/2025. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights, including the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Federal Public Defender appointed to represent Defendant. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Defendant, through counsel, waived both the Preliminary and Detention Hearings. The Court entered findings, on the record, and found probable cause. The Court also entered findings that Defendant was a flight risk and denied bond; a written order to follow. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; a written order to follow. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Devin Walker, AUSA; Judith Pena, AFPD. (USPO: Alicia Trevino) (ERO: Sandra Ann Silva) (Interpreter: Cristina Helmerichs, used) (DUSM: Mayra Buban). (jhacker, ) [7:25-mj-00363]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Melissa Evelia Lopez, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Susana Anguiano-Velasquez, filed. (Lopez, Melissa) [7:25-mj-00363]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Benjamin Storey Lyles appearing for USA, filed. (Lyles, Benjamin) [7:25-mj-00363]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Susana Anguiano-Velasquez (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, ) [7:25-mj-00363]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Susana Anguiano-Velasquez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, ) [7:25-mj-00363]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Susana Anguiano-Velasquez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, ) [7:25-mj-00363]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Susana Anguiano-Velasquez, filed. [7:25-mj-00363]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Susana Anguiano-Velasquez, filed. (ah7) [7:25-mj-00363]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
8 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Susana Anguiano-Velasquez (1) count(s) 1, filed. (xa7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Susana Anguiano-Velasquez, filed. (xa7)
Related: [-]