Louisiana Western District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00041
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Friday Mar 21, 2025 2:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Jamal Bailey (1)
Represented By
Caroline (Tory) Green
Federal Public Defenders Office (shv)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jessica Diane Cassidy
U S Attorneys Office (shv)
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/21/2025 3:55 AM CDT
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Jamal Bailey (1) Count(s) 1, 2. (crt,YocumSld, M) Modified sealed status on 3/13/2025 (YocumSld, M).
Related: [-]
2 2 INDICTMENT WITH SIGNATURE filed under seal as to Jamal Bailey (1). (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET filed under seal as to Jamal Bailey (1). (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Seal Indictment / Case by USA as to Jamal Bailey (1). Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/19/2025. (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting4 Motion to Seal Indictment / Case as to Jamal Bailey (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/19/2025. (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
6 6 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst: GRAND JURY REPORT as to Jamal Bailey (1). Sealed Indictment. Warrant to issue. (Court Reporter: LCR, Lafayette-Crtrm 7) (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]