Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence G Berg
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:25-cv-10790
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Bollinger Motors, Inc.
Represented By
James E. Morgan
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Miles Macik
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Claire Elizabeth Montgomery
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Bollinger
Represented By
Thomas Boyd
Winthrop & Weinstine, P.A.
contact info
Howard W. Burdett, Jr.
Winthrop & Weinstine, P.A.
contact info

GPO May 05 2025
OPINION AND ORDER Granting 18 MOTION to Seal filed by Robert Bollinger. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (EVra)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
29 29 17 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 9:20 PM
ORDER Appointing Receiver. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (EVra)
Related: [-]
minutes Evidentiary Hearing Wed 05/07 11:58 AM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Evidentiary Hearing held on 5/7/2025 (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (EVra)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 05/07 11:58 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: After completing evidentiary hearing on Plaintiffs Renewed Motion to Appoint Receiver ECF No.17 , and for the reasons stated on the record, the motion is GRANTED; parties to submit formal written Order regarding the same by close of business May 7, 2025. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (EVra)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
28 28 7 pgs order Order Mon 05/05 1:29 PM
OPINION AND ORDER Granting18 MOTION to Seal filed by Robert Bollinger. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (EVra)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Protective Order Mon 05/05 12:55 PM
ORDER to Protect Plaintiff's Assets While Motion for Receiver is Pending. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (EVra)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
26 26 notice Correction Fri 05/02 7:13 AM
NOTICE of Correction re25 Transcript: Docket entry made on wrong case. (JPur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
25 25 misc Transcript Thu 05/01 4:26 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Summary Judgment held on 03/11/2025. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 34) (Appeal Purposes) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 5/22/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2025. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
24 24 order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Wed 04/30 1:26 PM
ORDER Requiring Parties to Submit a Joint Discovery Plan Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(f). Response due by 5/21/2025. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (SPin)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Stipulation and Order Wed 04/30 10:35 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
22 22 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Mon 04/28 2:55 PM
OPINION AND ORDER Granting18 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/24 7:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Bollinger Motors, Inc.. (Macik, Miles)
Related: [-]
20 20 12 pgs respm Response to Motion Thu 04/24 12:47 PM
RESPONSE to17 Renewed MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Bollinger Motors, Inc.. (Macik, Miles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Mullen Contributions
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
19 19 misc Sealed Document - Other Tue 04/22 4:29 PM
SEALED Declaration of R. Bollinger and Exhibit A re18 MOTION to Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Burdett, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
18 18 motion Seal Tue 04/22 4:14 PM
MOTION to Seal by Robert Bollinger. (Burdett, Howard)
Related: [-]
17 17 13 pgs motion Appoint Receiver Tue 04/22 3:43 PM
Renewed MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Robert Bollinger. (Burdett, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits A-C,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Monday, April 07, 2025
16 16 1 pgs notice Appear* Mon 04/07 12:13 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/7/2025 09:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
15 15 notice Notice - Other Thu 04/03 3:34 PM
NOTICE by Robert Bollinger re14 Notice (Other) Responding to Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's April 1, 2025 Proposed Order (Burdett, Howard) Modified on 4/3/2025 (LHam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits A-B,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
14 14 notice Notice - Other Wed 04/02 4:41 PM
NOTICE by Bollinger Motors, Inc. Objecting to Plaintiff's April 1, 2025 Proposed Order (Macik, Miles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Proposed Order
13 13 misc Transcript Wed 04/02 2:57 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Emergency Motion for Appointment of Receiver held on 03/31/2025. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 47) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 4/23/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2025. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver Order on Motion to Quash Tue 04/01 12:52 PM
Bench Order rendered at a hearing held on 3/31/2025 before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs Emergency Motion to Appoint Receiver, ECF No. 3; DENYING Defendants Motion to Quash Subpoena, ECF No. 11; ORDERING Plaintiff to submit a proposed order to protect Defendants assets by the close of business on 4/1/25; and ORDERING the Parties to submit proposed dates and times for an evidentiary hearing to be held on a Motion to Appoint Receiver. (TEXT-ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED) (AChu)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Tue 04/01 12:48 PM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Motion Hearing held on 3/31/2025 re3 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Robert Bollinger. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (AChu)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 30, 2025
11 11 motion Quash Sun 03/30 3:59 PM
MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Bollinger Motors, Inc.. (Macik, Miles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Subpoena
Saturday, March 29, 2025
10 10 respm Response to Motion Sat 03/29 4:50 PM
RESPONSE to3 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Bollinger Motors, Inc.. (Macik, Miles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 notice Appearance Thu 03/27 5:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Boyd on behalf of Robert Bollinger. (Boyd, Thomas)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Certificate of Service Thu 03/27 12:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re4 Notice of Hearing on Motion,1 Complaint,,,,3 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Robert Bollinger (Burdett, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
7 7 notice Appearance Wed 03/26 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Morgan on behalf of Bollinger Motors, Inc.. (Morgan, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Wed 03/26 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Elizabeth Montgomery on behalf of Bollinger Motors, Inc.. (Montgomery, Claire)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Wed 03/26 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Miles Macik on behalf of Bollinger Motors, Inc.. (Macik, Miles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
4 4 notice Hearing on Motion* Tue 03/25 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on3 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver . Response due by 3/30/2025 at 12:00 p.m. (noon). Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2025 10:30 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
3 3 motion Appoint Receiver Mon 03/24 10:07 AM
Emergency MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Robert Bollinger. (Burdett, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits A-B,
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit B: Qualifications as Receiver
2 2 service Summons Issued* Mon 03/24 9:41 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Bollinger Motors, Inc.* (LHam)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 03/24 9:41 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LHam)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
1 1 16 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 03/21 11:37 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Robert Bollinger against Bollinger Motors, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10166088 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Burdett, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits A-G,
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Amended and Restated Secured Promissory Note,
Att: 3 Exhibit B: UCC-1 Financing Statement,
Att: 4 Exhibit C: March 5, 2025 Default Correspondence to Bollinger Motors,
Att: 5 Exhibit D: March 12, 2025 correspondence to Bollinger Motors,
Att: 6 Exhibit E: January 3, 2025 correspondence to Bollinger Motors,
Att: 7 Exhibit F: January 8, 2025 correspondence from Bollinger Motors,
Att: 8 Exhibit G: Lawsuit filed on March 11, 2025 by Auto Metal Craft, Inc. v. Bollinger Motors