Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:25-cv-00322
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 5:27 AM CDT
Defendant
American Renal Management LLC
Plaintiff
Steevenson Jolicoeur
Represented By
Leanna A. Loginov
Shamis & Gentile, P.A.
contact info
Andrew J. Shamis
Shamis & Gentile, PA
contact info
David K. Lietz
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
James Gerard Stranch, IV
Stranch, Jennings & Garvey, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
14 14 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/16 4:14 PM
ORDER granting9 and13 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for David K. Lietz and Leanna Alexis Loginov to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 04/16/2025. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/11 3:56 PM
MOTION for attorney LEANNA ALEXIS LOGINOV to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4300194) by Steevenson Jolicoeur.(Stranch, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Cert. of Good Standing
Thursday, April 03, 2025
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/03 2:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steevenson Jolicoeur. American Renal Management LLC waiver sent on 3/24/2025. (Stranch, James)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/03 2:13 PM
NOTICE by Steevenson Jolicoeur re10 Summons Returned Executed NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE ERROR (Stranch, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/02 1:39 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Steevenson Jolicoeur. American Renal Management LLC served on 3/25/2025. (Stranch, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 03/25 10:19 AM
DC State Bar status verified as active for David K. Lietz not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/24 3:16 PM
MOTION for attorney David K. Lietz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4285520) by Steevenson Jolicoeur.(Lietz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Court Admissions,
Att: 2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
8 8 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/24 10:42 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/24/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
7 7 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Fri 03/21 11:36 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Steevenson Jolicoeur. (Stranch, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Fri 03/21 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/24/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ch)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Fri 03/21 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ch)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 03/21 9:36 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ch)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 03/21 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ch)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 03/21 9:25 AM
Summons issued as to American Renal Management LLC. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (ch)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 03/21 9:38 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for James Gerard Stranch, IV admitted to this court . (ch)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 03/21 9:41 AM
FL State Bar status verified as active for Andrew J. Shamis admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ch)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 03/21 9:53 AM
NY State Bar status verified as active for Leanna A. Loginov not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ch)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 03/21 9:55 AM
DC State Bar status verified as active for David K. Lietz not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ch)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - PHV Fri 03/21 9:55 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL David K. Lietz, Leanna A. Loginov: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/11/2025. (ch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/21 8:59 AM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against American Renal Management LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4283265), filed by Steevenson Jolicoeur.(ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet