Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Case #: 4:25-cv-00021
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause28:1442 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 2:41 AM MDT
Defendant
Somont Oil Company
Represented By
Devon Michael Conroy
Davis, Hatley, Haffeman & Tighe, P.C.
contact info
Stephanie A. Hollar
Davis Hatley Haffeman & Tighe
contact info
Michael Golz
Davis Graham & Stubbs LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pamela Bye
Represented By
Hertha Lund
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Peter B. Taylor
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Bye
Represented By
Hertha Lund
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Peter B. Taylor
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Korey Fauque
Represented By
Hertha Lund
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Peter B. Taylor
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wendy Fauque
Represented By
Hertha Lund
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Peter B. Taylor
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Butch Gillespie
Represented By
Hertha Lund
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Peter B. Taylor
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Doreen Gillespie
Represented By
Hertha Lund
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Peter B. Taylor
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Roxy Gillespie
Represented By
Hertha Lund
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Peter B. Taylor
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Gillespie
Represented By
Hertha Lund
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Peter B. Taylor
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Does 1, 2, 3, 4
Represented By
Hertha Lund
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info
Peter B. Taylor
Lund Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Saturday, May 10, 2025
28 28 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Sat 05/10 12:07 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re27 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference filed by Somont Oil Company. (Conroy, Devon)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Continue Sat 05/10 12:05 PM
MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference . Devon Michael Conroy appearing for Defendant Somont Oil Company. (Conroy, Devon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Thursday, May 08, 2025
26 26 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Thu 05/08 9:37 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re25 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Somont Oil Company. (Conroy, Devon)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Dismiss - SDM Thu 05/08 9:34 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint . Devon Michael Conroy appearing for Defendant Somont Oil Company. (Conroy, Devon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/24 9:45 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (second) and first supplemental complaint against Somont Oil Company, filed by Korey Fauque, Roxy Gillespie, Pamela Bye, Scott Bye, Wendy Fauque, Butch Gillespie, Doreen Gillespie, Wayne Gillespie. (Taylor, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 04/23 12:14 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs will file their second amended complaint. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the Motion Hearing set for April 24, 2025 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/23/2025. (MMS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/22 9:48 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Somont Oil Company. (Conroy, Devon)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/22 9:41 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re19 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and First Supplemental Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial filed by Somont Oil Company. (Conroy, Devon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Response to Motion to Amend Complaint
Monday, April 21, 2025
utility Remark Mon 04/21 9:57 AM
Remark: With regard to Plaintiff's19 MOTION to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is reminded that pursuant to L.R. 7.1(d)(1)(A) "... briefs in support of a motion must be filed separately from the motion..." This notice is for your information for future filings, the document does not need to be re-filed. In addition, please make sure filed documents are signed properly. Thank you. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
20 20 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/18 6:09 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pamela Bye, Scott Bye, Korey Fauque, Wendy Fauque, Butch Gillespie, Doreen Gillespie, Roxy Gillespie, Wayne Gillespie. (Taylor, Peter)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Leave to File Document Fri 04/18 4:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and First Supplemental Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial . Peter B. Taylor appearing for Plaintiffs Pamela Bye, Scott Bye, Korey Fauque, Wendy Fauque, Butch Gillespie, Doreen Gillespie, Roxy Gillespie, Wayne Gillespie. (Taylor, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
18 18 order Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM Mon 04/07 12:11 PM
TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Somont Oil Company: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Motion Hearing is set for 4/24/2025 at 03:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/7/2025. (SLL)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT Mon 04/07 10:16 AM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/19/2025. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/19/2025. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/19/2025. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/7/2025. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
16 16 misc Clerk's Notice of Reassignment - MT Fri 04/04 8:24 AM
Clerk's Notice of Reassignment. Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1 and objection having been made to the jurisdiction of an U.S. Magistrate Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Brian Morris. Please update case number on filings CV-25-21-GF-BMM (ACC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
15 15 utility Remark Tue 04/01 3:17 PM
Remark: Original State Court Documents received from Toole County and placed on shelf in the clerk's office. Attached receipt of removal returned to Debra Munson via mail. (KJC)
Related: [-]
14 14 20 pgs cmp Complaint - SDM Tue 04/01 3:06 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (STATE COURT) Filed in Montana Ninth Judicial District against All Defendants, filed by Korey Fauque, Roxy Gillespie, Pamela Bye, Scott Bye, Wendy Fauque, Butch Gillespie, Doreen Gillespie, Wayne Gillespie, John Does 1, 2, 3, 4. (KJC) Modified on 4/1/2025 (MMS)
Related: [-]
13 13 order State Court Order Tue 04/01 2:58 PM
STATE COURT ORDER Filed in Montana Ninth Judicial District. Signed by Hon. Kaydee Snipes Ruiz on 8/26/2024. (KJC)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of State Court File Received Tue 04/01 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILE RECEIVED Additional attachment ( from Montana Ninth Judicial District, case number DV-20-018.) (KJC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Brief In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 3 Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Facts,
Att: 4 Plaintiffs' Response to Somont's Motion for Entry of Judgment,
Att: 5 Plaintiffs' Response to Somont's M.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(6) Motion,
Att: 6 Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint,
Att: 7 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines,
Att: 8 Plaintiffs' Response Brief Opposing Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 9 Plaintiffs' Statement of Disputed Facts,
Att: 10 Defendant's Reply Brief in Further Support of M.R.Civ.P. 58 Motion for Entry of Judgment,
Att: 11 Memorandum in Response to Plaintiffs' M.R.Civ.P. 56 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,
Att: 12 Memorandum in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint,
Att: 13 Somont's Statement of Disputed Facts in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,
Att: 14 Reply Brief in Further Support of M.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Cause of Action for Declaratory Judgment,
Att: 15 Order (extend deadlines),
Att: 16 Reply Brief in Further Support of Defendant's M.R.Civ.P. 56 Motions for Summary Judgment,
Att: 17 Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint,
Att: 18 Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 19 Plaintiffs' Rule 56(f) Motion and Brief,
Att: 20 Declaration of Korey Fauque,
Att: 21 Minute Entry December 3, 2024,
Att: 22 Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' M.R.Civ.P. 56(f) Motion,
Att: 23 Declaration of Charles Jansky,
Att: 24 Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Rule 56(f), Mont. R. Civ. P. Motion for Denial of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 25 Order Granting Leave to File Amended Complaint,
Att: 26 Minute Entry March 12, 2025,
Att: 27 Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal of Consent to Entry of Judgment on Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 28 Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Consent to Entry of Judgment on Preliminary Injunction
11 11 notice Notice of State Court File Received Tue 04/01 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILE Additional Attachments ( from Montana Ninth Judicial District, case number DV-20-018.), #14 Defendant's Response on Stay of Proceedings Pending Appeal, #15 Supreme Court-Opinion, #16 Order Setting Status Hearing, #17 Remittitur, #18 Notice of Appearance of Counsel for the Defendant (Devon M. Conroy), #19 Minute Entry August 12, 2024, #20 Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Peter B. Taylor in place of Christopher Scoones), #21 Defendant's M.R.Civ.P. 56 Motion for Summary Judgment, #22 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's M.R.Civ.P. 56 Motions for Summary Judgment, #23 Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Facts, #24 Defendant's M.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Cause of Action for Declaratory Judgment, #25 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's M.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Cause of Action for Declaratory Judgment, #26 Defendant's M.R.Civ.P. 58 Motion for Entry of Judgment, #27 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's M.R.Civ.P. 58 Motion for Entry of Judgment) (KJC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Scheduling Conference,
Att: 2 Notice of Issue and Request for Show Cause Hearing on Somont's Motion to Increase Plaintiffs' Written Undertaking,
Att: 3 Order Following July 14, 2020 Hearing-Amended Order Granting Preliminary lnjuction and Requiring Written Undertaking and Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference,
Att: 4 Order Resetting Telephonic Scheduling Conference,
Att: 5 Copy Notice of Appeal to the Supreme Court,
Att: 6 Notice of Filing (Notice of Appeal),
Att: 7 Notice of Appeal (filed by Defendant),
Att: 8 Notice of Transcripts Deemed Necessary for Appeal and Request for Said Transcripts,
Att: 9 Order Setting Briefing Schedule,
Att: 10 Minute Entry 12/15/2022,
Att: 11 Plaintiffs' Brief on Stay of Proceedings Pending Somont's Appeal,
Att: 12 Notice of Filing (Supreme Court received the file on Janaury 12, 2023),
Att: 13 Notice {appeal transcript was distributed to all parties listed in the certificate of service
10 10 notice Notice of State Court File Received Tue 04/01 12:15 PM
NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILE RECEIVED Additional Attachments ( from Montana Ninth Judicial District, case number DV-20-018.), #3 Defendant's Exhibit M (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing), #4 Defendant's Exhibit N (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing), #5 Minute Entry July 14, 2020, #6 Order Granting Preliminary Injunction and Requiring Written Undertaking //cert of service, #7 Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Letter of Credit, #8 Defendant's Objection to Sufficiency of Plaintiffs' Required Written Undertaking, #9 Notice of Appeal ( copy-file transfer from the Supreme Court), #10 Notice of Filing (appeal from the Supreme Court), #11 Notice of Appeal (from G. Hatley), #12 Notice of Transcripts Deemed Necessary for Appeal and Request for Said Transcripts, #13 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Objection to Sufficiency of Written Undertaking, #14 Notice of Filing (Supreme Court Received the District Court File), #15 Affidavit (transcript extension), #16 Order-transcript extension //cert of service, #17 Amended Notice of Filing (Supreme Court Received the District Court File), #18 Order (transcripts extension) //cert of service, #19 Affidavit, #20 Affidavit, #21 Order-transcript extension //cert of service, #22 Affidavit, #23 Order (transcript extension to March 8, 2021) //cert of service, #24 Appeal Transcript Distributed to all Parties, #25 Remittitur-Reversed and Remanded (Opinion Attached), #26 Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, #27 Defendant's Objection to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #28 Plaintiffs Response to Defendant's Objection to Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #29 Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of its Objection to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #30 Defendant's Motion to Increase Plaintiffs' Written Undertaking, #31 Supplemental Declaration of Charles Jansky, #32 Plaintiffs' Objection to Somont's Motion to Increase Plaintiffs Written Undertaking, #33 Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Increase Plaintiffs' Written Undertaking) (KJC). Modified on 4/1/2025 (KJC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant's Exhibit K (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing),
Att: 2 Defendant's Exhibit L {admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/01 11:46 AM
DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to8 Complaint by Somont Oil Company. (KJC)
Related: [-]
8 8 6 pgs cmp Complaint - SDM Tue 04/01 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT (STATE COURT) against Somont Oil Company, filed by Korey Fauque, Roxy Gillespie, Pamela Bye, Scott Bye, Wendy Fauque, Butch Gillespie, Doreen Gillespie, Wayne Gillespie, John Does 1, 2, 3, 4. (KJC) Modified on 4/1/2025 (MMS)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of State Court File Received Tue 04/01 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILE RECEIVED ( from Montana Ninth Judicial District, case number DV-20-018.), #34 Defendant's Exhibit D (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing)) (KJC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application for TRO and Preliminary Injuction,
Att: 2 Declaration of Scott Bye,
Att: 3 Declaration of Wayne Gillespie,
Att: 4 Notice of Issuance Summons (Somont Oil Company, Inc.),
Att: 5 Invitation and Assumption of Jurisdiction //cert of service,
Att: 6 Affidavit of Service-H. Lund & C. Scoones,
Att: 7 Notice of Appearance (G. Hatley),
Att: 8 Acknowledgment of Service,
Att: 9 Affidavit of Service-G. Hatley,
Att: 10 Defendant's Response to Application for TRO and Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 11 Declaration of Charles Jansky,
Att: 12 Order (show cause hearing-June 8, 2020 at 2:00 p.m.) //cert of service,
Att: 13 Unopposed Motion to Set the Location for the June 8, 2020 Show Cause Hearing and Allowing Defendant's Representative to Appear via Video Conference,
Att: 14 Unopposed Motion to Continue Hearing and Set a Scheduling Conference,
Att: 15 Order (Telephonic Conference June 8, 2020 at 1 :30 p.m.) //cert of service,
Att: 16 Minute Entry June 8, 2020,
Att: 17 Order Setting Hearing //cert of service,
Att: 18 Plaintiffs Hearing Brief on Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 19 Defendant's Hearing Brief on Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 20 Amended Certificate of Service RE Defendant's Hearing Brief on Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 21 Defendant's Preliminary Injunction Hearing Exhibits,
Att: 22 Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Hearing Exhibits,
Att: 23 Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing),
Att: 24 Plaintiff's Exhibit 2 (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing),
Att: 25 Plaintiff's Exhibit 3 (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing),
Att: 26 Plaintiff's Exhibit 7 (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing),
Att: 27 Plaintiff's Exhibit 8 (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing),
Att: 28 Plaintiff's Exhibit 10 (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing),
Att: 29 Plaintiff's Exhibit 13 (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing),
Att: 30 Plaintiff's Exhibit 14 (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing),
Att: 31 Plaintiff's Exhibit 16 (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing),
Att: 32 Defendant's Exhibit B (admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing),
Att: 33 Defendant's Exhibit C {admitted at the July 14, 2020 hearing
Friday, March 28, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/28 11:38 AM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Devon Michael Conroy appearing for Defendant Somont Oil Company. (Conroy, Devon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion
utility Remark Fri 03/28 11:51 AM
Remark: With regard to Defendant's 48 Partial MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff is reminded that pursuant to L.R. 7.1(d)(1)(A) "... briefs in support of a motion must be filed separately from the motion ..." This notice is for your information for future filings, the document does not need to be re-filed. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
5 5 utility Notice of Correction - MT Wed 03/26 4:15 PM
Notice of Correction: re4 Notice (Other). The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (ACC)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/26 3:51 PM
Individual Party Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge form. Modified on 3/26/2025 to change security level and update docket text(ACC)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/21 4:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Notice of Interested Parties by Somont Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent Jansky Family LP for Somont Oil Company. (Conroy, Devon)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notification of Assignment to USMJ - MT Fri 03/21 10:34 AM
Service of Notification of Assignment to Magistrate Judge form. Objection to USMJ Form due by 4/4/2025. (ACC)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal - SDM Fri 03/21 10:33 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Ninth Judicial District Court, Toole County, case number CV-20-018. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- Summons and Acknowledgment,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Answer,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - 60 Day CWA Notice,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Order Leave File Amended Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Amended Complaint,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 03/21 10:34 AM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number AMTDC-3448929 (ACC)
Related: [-]