Utah District Court
Judge:Robert J Shelby
Referred: Cecilia M Romero
Case #: 2:25-cv-00216
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Case in other court:Fourth Judicial District Court Utah County, 240406234
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 2:59 AM MDT
Defendant
Tribest Corp
Represented By
Brian M. Rothschild
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Jesus Salazar
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Katherine E. Venti
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Joseph E. Minnock
Morgan Minnock Rice & Miner
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Carlston
Represented By
Kenneth Parkinson
Howard Lewis & Petersen
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 1:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting 16 Motion for Scheduling Order. Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 9/1/2025. Expert Discovery due by 8/1/2026. Motions due by 9/15/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 4/28/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 9:55 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Tribest Corp. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Minnock, Joseph)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Attorney Planning Meeting Mon 04/28 9:54 AM
REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Minnock, Joseph)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 04/28 9:13 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re13 Attorney Planning Meeting : The parties did not file a stipulated motion for scheduling order as required under paragraph 3 of the10 Order to Propose Schedule.13 Attorney Planning Meeting stricken. The clerk requests a party to file a stipulated motion for scheduling order. The motion will receive a new document number on the docket. (mh)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
13 13 misc Attorney Planning Meeting Sat 04/26 3:15 PM
REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Minnock, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Wed 04/02 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Katherine Venti filed by Katherine E. Venti on behalf of Tribest Corp (Venti, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Minnock on behalf of Tribest Corp (Minnock, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Mon 03/31 9:23 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 03/21/2025. (sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
9 9 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/28 10:27 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/28/2025. (mjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 9:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jesus Salazar on behalf of Tribest Corp (Salazar, Jesus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/26 10:40 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Tribest Corp.(Venti, Katherine)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty) Wed 03/26 10:39 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Tribest Corp identifying Tribest Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Venti, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
5 5 misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Mon 03/24 2:59 PM
RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Defendant Tribest Corp. (mh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Fri 03/21 3:38 PM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Anthony Carlston. (mh)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Fri 03/21 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Anthony Carlston, Defendant Tribest Corp. (kec)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 03/21 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-3, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Anthony Carlston, Defendant Tribest Corp. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 4/11/2025. (kec)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Atty) Fri 03/21 9:43 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 4th District Court Utah County, case number 240406234, (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BUTDC-5369073) filed by Tribest Corp. (Venti, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 03/21 10:04 AM
Judge Robert J. Shelby added. Case number will now read 2:25-cv-00216-RJS. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)
Related: [-]