New Jersey District Court
Judge:Julien Xavier Neals
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:25-cv-02005
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of Bergen County New Jersey, BER L 001394 25
Last checked: Friday Mar 21, 2025 2:08 PM EDT
Defendant
THE HARTFORD
Represented By
MICHAEL S. SAVETT
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
ADAM BLAKE MASEF
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
VAN NOS ASSOCIATES LLC
Represented By
JEFFREY A. BRONSTER
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
qc QC - Fillable PDF Thu 05/01 10:11 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Diversity Disclosure Statement9 filed by JEFFREY BRONSTER on 4/29/2025 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (and)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
10 10 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/30 7:31 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/30/2025. (lag, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 04/30 2:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/30/2025. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 4:11 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by VAN NOS ASSOCIATES LLC. (BRONSTER, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
8 8 order Text Order Mon 04/28 4:40 PM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a diversity disclosure statement pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2) no later than 5:00 p.m. on April 29, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/28/25. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
7 7 discov Joint Discovery Plan Fri 04/25 4:49 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by THE HARTFORD.(MASEF, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
6 6 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 03/31 10:00 AM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/30/2025 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/31/25. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/28 12:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by THE HARTFORD.(MASEF, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/21 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM BLAKE MASEF on behalf of THE HARTFORD (MASEF, ADAM)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 03/21 10:53 AM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by THE HARTFORD. (SAVETT, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 03/21 10:36 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE HARTFORD identifying The Hartford Insurance Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SAVETT, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/21 10:07 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE HARTFORD from Superior Court of Bergen County New Jersey, case number BER L 001394 25. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16108492), filed by THE HARTFORD.(SAVETT, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Writ of Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/21 1:34 PM
Case assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
Related: [-]