Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:25-cv-00324
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
4 4 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/24 4:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Commissioner is ORDERED to file a copy of the certified administrative record and an answer no later than 60 days after issuance of the Notice of Electronic Filing. Soc. Sec. R. 4(a). The certified administrative record may serve as the answer. Soc. Sec. R. 4(b). If the Commissioner files a motion under Rule 12, that motion must be filed no later than 60 days after issuance of the Notice of Electronic Filing. Soc. Sec. R. 4(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 03/24/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/21 12:35 PM
NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES ARISING UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). (kc) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/21/2025) (kc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 03/21 12:30 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Social Security Complaint Fri 03/21 12:29 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Leland Dudek (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4284151), filed by Ranada Bridges.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 03/21 1:37 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Melanie N. Williams admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]