Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:25-cv-00325
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/21 5:00 PM
MOTION for Habeas Corpus and Dismiss of All Charges of Cases by Vaughn Sherwin Harris.(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Cover Letter
Friday, April 11, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss Fri 04/11 11:06 AM
MOTION for Habeas Corpus and Dismiss of all Charges of Cases by Vaughn Sherwin Harris. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 03/27 8:49 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Taylor Michael Durrett admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/26 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Michael Durrett on behalf of Daron Hall (Durrett, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 03/21 12:46 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 03/21 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/21 12:45 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Vaughn Harris. (sb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 03/21 12:44 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Vaughn Harris.(sb)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Docket Fri 03/21 12:47 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (Docket Sheet, Certificate of Service form, and Notice of Consent form included). (sb)
Related: [-]