Connecticut District Court
Judge:Robert N Chatigny
Case #: 3:25-cv-00469
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Deborah Fox
Defendant
Gervon Fox
Defendant
Yvette Hill
Defendant
Kim Nolet
Plaintiff
Arenas, Parks and Stadiums Solutions, Inc
Represented By
Thomas J. Sansone
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, Llp - Nh
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Boldis Caccamo
Represented By
Thomas J. Sansone
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, Llp - Nh
contact info
Plaintiff
Vincent Caccamo
Represented By
Thomas J. Sansone
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, Llp - Nh
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/12 11:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Boldis Caccamo, Arenas, Parks and Stadiums Solutions, Inc, Vincent Caccamo. Kim Nolet served on 5/6/2025, answer due 5/27/2025. (Sansone, Thomas)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/12 11:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Boldis Caccamo, Arenas, Parks and Stadiums Solutions, Inc, Vincent Caccamo. Yvette Hill served on 4/30/2025, answer due 5/21/2025. (Sansone, Thomas)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/12 11:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Boldis Caccamo, Arenas, Parks and Stadiums Solutions, Inc, Vincent Caccamo. Deborah Fox served on 4/30/2025, answer due 5/21/2025. (Sansone, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
13 13 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 03/27 9:38 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Deborah Fox, Gervon Fox, Yvette Hill* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas J. Sansone* *Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH* *195 Church St. 18th floor PO Box 1950* *New Haven, CT 06509-1950*. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 03/26 12:04 PM
Disclosure Statement re: Parties' Citizenship, Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Arenas, Parks and Stadiums Solutions, Inc, Stephanie Boldis Caccamo, Vincent Caccamo. (Sansone, Thomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 03/26 11:53 AM
Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Arenas, Parks and Stadiums Solutions, Inc, Stephanie Boldis Caccamo, Vincent Caccamo. (Sansone, Thomas)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order of Transfer Wed 03/26 11:40 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Chatigny for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 3/26/2025.(Samson, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/25 1:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Arenas, Parks and Stadiums Solutions, Inc.(Sansone, Thomas)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Tue 03/25 1:03 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Deborah Fox, Gervon Fox, Yvette Hill. (Sansone, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 03/24 1:53 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Kim Nolet* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas J. Sansone* *Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH* *195 Church St. 18th floor PO Box 1950* *New Haven, CT 06509-1950*. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Electronic Service Documents Mon 03/24 1:49 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Electronic Filing Order,1 Complaint, filed by Arenas, Parks and Stadiums Solutions, Inc,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,5 Standing Protective Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Signed by Clerk on 3/24/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
6 6 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Mon 03/24 1:47 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Mon 03/24 1:46 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 3/21/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Mon 03/24 1:44 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 3/21/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Mon 03/24 1:43 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/20/2025 Discovery due by 9/22/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 10/27/2025 Signed by Clerk on 3/21/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Mon 03/24 11:17 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 3/21/2025.(Higgins, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/21 3:53 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-8107483.), filed by Arenas, Parks and Stadiums Solutions, Inc, Stephanie Boldis Caccamo, Vincent Caccamo.(Sansone, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service Request to Issue Summons Fri 03/21 3:55 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Sansone, Thomas)
Related: [-]
utility NEW Case Assignment Mon 03/24 11:28 AM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Vernon D. Oliver assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]