Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 1:25-cv-00018
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 3:58 AM CDT
Defendant
Giles County, Tennessee
Represented By
Donald A. Saulters
Ortale Kelley Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Joe Fite
Represented By
Larry Lamont Crain
Crain Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Emily A. Castro
Crain Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion to Continue Wed 04/16 12:31 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant Giles County, Tennessee's motion for extension of time to file answer or other responsive pleadings (Docket No.10 ) and motion to reschedule initial case management conference (Docket No.11 ), both of which are represented to be unopposed and both of which are therefore GRANTED. Accordingly, the time for Defendant Giles County, Tennessee to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to May 16, 2025. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED for June 16, 2025, at 3:00 p.m. (CDT) using the Court's conference line at 1-855-244-8681, access code 2300 984 3452#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/16/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (sb)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 04/16 8:07 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Donald A. Saulters admitted to this court . (sb)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 04/16 12:42 PM
Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone reset for 6/16/2025 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (sb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
11 11 motion Continue Tue 04/15 1:30 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Giles County, Tennessee. (Saulters, Donald)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/15 9:54 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Giles County, Tennessee. (Saulters, Donald)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Donald A. Saulters on behalf of Giles County, Tennessee (Saulters, Donald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 03/26 8:23 AM
Summons issued as to Giles County, Tennessee. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (sb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Tue 03/25 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Giles County, Tennessee. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Crain, Larry)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/24 10:31 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/24/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (sb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Fri 03/21 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/24/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ab)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 03/21 3:47 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ab)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Fri 03/21 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ab)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 03/21 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ab)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/21 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Giles County, Tennessee (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4284532), filed by Joe Fite.(ab) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/21/2025) (ab)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter to Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Notice,
Att: 3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 03/21 3:52 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Larry Lamont Crain, Emily A. Castro admitted to this court . (ab)
Related: [-]