Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:25-cv-00327
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 3:58 AM CDT
Defendant
Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff
National Healthcare Corporation
Represented By
Rachel Sodee
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings Llp (nashville, Tn Office)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 04/24 1:38 PM
ORDER: On April 23, 2025, Plaintiff National Healthcare Corporation filed an unopposed motion to continue the initial case management conference set on May 29, 2025. (Doc. No.9 ). The motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to June 27, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (650) 479-3207 and enter access code 2317 604 8628# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/24/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 04/24 1:39 PM
Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 6/27/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
9 9 motion Continue Wed 04/23 10:47 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference by National Healthcare Corporation. (Sodee, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
8 8 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Thu 04/03 2:53 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by National Healthcare Corporation. (Sodee, Rachel)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/03 2:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by National Healthcare Corporation. Federal Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/3/2025. (Sodee, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/25 4:25 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/25/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Fri 03/21 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 5/29/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ad)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 03/21 2:27 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Fri 03/21 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 03/21 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/21 2:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4284317), filed by National Healthcare Corporation.(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Chubb Policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Collective letters,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Collective letters,
Att: 4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 03/21 2:29 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Rachel Sodee admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]