Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Craig S Denney
Case #: 3:25-cv-00161
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Case in other court:Second Judicial District Court, CV25-00548
Last checked: Friday Mar 21, 2025 4:06 PM PDT
Defendant
Carson City
Represented By
Katherine F. Parks
Thorndal Armstrong, PC
contact info
Defendant
Carson City Sheriff's Office
Represented By
Katherine F. Parks
Thorndal Armstrong, PC
contact info
Defendant
Rocky Goetz
Represented By
Katherine F. Parks
Thorndal Armstrong, PC
contact info
Defendant
Anthony Viglietta
Represented By
Katherine F. Parks
Thorndal Armstrong, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Adams, husband of Korina Adams, deceased
Represented By
Robert H. Broili
contact info
Robert J. Bennett
contact info
Plaintiff
The Estate of Destiny Darling, by Michele Darling, Personal Representative
Represented By
Robert H. Broili
contact info
Robert J. Bennett
contact info
Plaintiff
The Estate of Korina Adams, by Michele Darling, Personal Representative
Represented By
Robert H. Broili
contact info
Robert J. Bennett
contact info
Plaintiff
Michele Darling, mother of the decedents
Represented By
Robert H. Broili
contact info
Robert J. Bennett
contact info
Plaintiff
P.L. and R.A., minor children of Korina Adams
Represented By
Robert H. Broili
contact info
Robert J. Bennett
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
14 14 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Tue 04/29 7:06 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
13 13 minord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/28 4:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/28/2025. The court has approved the parties' Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (ECF No. 12), and it does not appear that an initial case management conference is necessary. If the parties disagree, they may file a stipulation requesting a case management conference. In the event a discovery dispute arises, the parties shall follow the informal discovery dispute procedure outlined in the Court's Civil Standing Order (ECF No. 4). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Case Management Conference scheduled for Tuesday, May 6, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
12 12 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 3:59 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting11 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Discovery due by 9/29/2025. Motions due by 10/29/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/28/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/28/2025.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 2:12 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re8 Order,, by Defendants Carson City, Carson City Sheriff's Office, Rocky Goetz, Anthony Viglietta. (Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Case Management Report Mon 04/28 2:08 PM
Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendants Carson City, Carson City Sheriff's Office, Rocky Goetz, Anthony Viglietta. (Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
9 9 misc Status Report Wed 04/23 4:38 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Carson City, Carson City Sheriff's Office, Rocky Goetz, Anthony Viglietta. (Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
8 8 6 pgs order Order Wed 04/02 8:16 AM
ORDER Setting Case Management Conference for Tuesday, May 6, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report electronically on CM/ECF by 4:00 p.m. on Wednesday, April 30, 2025. This report shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages and shall not include any attached exhibits. In advance of the mandatory case management conference, the parties shall file a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order no later than Wednesday, April 30, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/2/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
7 7 misc Statement in Removal Case Tue 04/01 3:23 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Carson City, Carson City Sheriff's Office, Rocky Goetz, Anthony Viglietta. (Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
6 6 misc Jury Demand Mon 03/31 2:13 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Carson City, Carson City Sheriff's Office, Rocky Goetz, Anthony Viglietta. (Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/31 2:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Carson City, Carson City Sheriff's Office, Rocky Goetz, Anthony Viglietta. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/10/2025. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/15/2025.(Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
4 4 order Standing Order Tue 03/25 2:23 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 minord Minute Order Removal Case Tue 03/25 7:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 3/25/2025. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/9/2025. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/24/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 03/25 7:35 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 03/24 2:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Carson City, Carson City Sheriff's Office, Rocky Goetz, Anthony Viglietta. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Fri 03/21 3:13 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV25-00548, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7994514) by Rocky Goetz, Anthony Viglietta, Carson City Sheriff's Office, Carson City. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/31/2025. (Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet