Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:25-bk-42888
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 05, 2025

Debtor
LYNEXT, INC.
998 E. Avondale Circle
Ypsilanti, MI 48198
Represented By
Sharon Kay Grace-Moore
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Mark H. Shapiro
25925 Telegraph Rd. Suite 203
Southfield, MI 48033


Docket last updated: 03/22/2025 12:02 AM EDT
Friday, March 21, 2025
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 03/21 11:26 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy : Fee Amount $0. Filed by LYNEXT, INC. (Grace-Moore, Sharon)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Pay Filing Fee in Installments Fri 03/21 11:27 PM
Application for Individuals to Pay the Filing Fee in Installments Filed by Debtor LYNEXT, INC. (Grace-Moore, Sharon)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b) Fri 03/21 11:27 PM
Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b) Filed by Debtor LYNEXT, INC.. (Grace-Moore, Sharon)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Bankruptcy Cover Sheet Fri 03/21 11:27 PM
Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor LYNEXT, INC.. (Grace-Moore, Sharon)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 (b) Fri 03/21 11:47 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Shapiro, Mark H. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/5/2025 at 09:30 AM via Zoom - Shapiro: Meeting ID 757 223 9121, Passcode 8252404297, Phone 1 947 214 5398. (AJTA)
Related: [-]