New York Southern District Court
Judge:Margaret M Garnett
Case #: 1:25-cv-02341
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 5:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Juan Irizarry
Defendant
Laz Parking Ltd., LLC
Plaintiff
Andre Lewis
1712 Sexton PL
Bronx, NY 10469


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
16 16 misc FRCP 4 Service Package - Mailed Fri 04/25 10:46 AM
INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Andre Lewis 1712 Sexton PL Bronx, NY 10469, at, on 4/25/2025 Re:14 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (nb)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued Fri 04/25 10:42 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laz Parking Ltd., LLC. (nb)
Related: [-]
misc FRCP 4 Service Package - Hand Delivered to U.S.M. Fri 04/25 10:43 AM
FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on Laz Parking Ltd., LLC Re: Judge Margaret M. Garnett14 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Laz Parking Ltd., LLC. (nb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 04/24 3:33 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 14. Mailed to: Andre Lewis 1712 Sexton PL Bronx, NY 10469. (anc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
14 14 5 pgs order Order of Service ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 04/23 4:42 PM
ORDER: The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to fill out a U.S. Marshals Service Process Receipt and Return form ("USM-285 form") for Defendant Laz Parking, and to issue a summons and deliver to the Marshals Service all the paperwork necessary for the Marshals Service to effect service upon this defendant. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to seal the entirety of this action, or the entirety of the Complaint, is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must notify the Court, within 30 days of the date of this Order, if he wishes to withdraw this action, amend his Complaint, or make a new request for specific and narrowly-tailored redactions with appropriate explanations of the basis for such redactions. If Plaintiff does not notify the Court that he wishes to pursue one of these remedies within the time prescribed, the Court will direct the Clerk of Court to remove the viewing restrictions on the public docket, and the action will proceed publicly. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiffs address of record and terminate Dkt. No. 8. It is further ORDERED that counsel for Defendant Laz Parking shall provide a service address for Defendant Irizany within 30 days of service upon Defendant Laz Parking. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated:8 MOTION to Seal Case filed by Andre Lewis. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 4/23/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 04/18 10:44 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 12. Mailed to: Andre Lewis 1712 Sexton PL Bronx, NY 10469. (kgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
12 12 order Order Granting IFP Application Thu 04/17 9:28 AM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/17/2025) (sac)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 04/17 5:10 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case..(kgo)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge Thu 04/17 5:11 PM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only..(kgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
11 11 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/15 12:33 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Andre Lewis. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 service Certificate of Service Other Wed 03/26 2:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Seal Case, Motion for Expedited Discovery, Motion for Protective Order, Motion for Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, Notice to Preserve served on Laz Parking Ltd, LLC-William Rocha; Juan Irizarry on 3/25/2025. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Andre Lewis. (ar)
Related: [-]
misc Mailing Receipt Tue 03/25 9:12 AM
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 3 pgs order Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application Mon 03/24 3:42 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR AMENDED IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an amended IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 4/23/2025. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 4/23/2025. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/24/2025) (scn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Amended IFP application
misc Mailing Receipt Mon 03/24 9:20 AM
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Mon 03/24 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(kgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
8 8 motion Seal Case Mon 03/24 1:46 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL CASE. Document filed by Andre Lewis. (jjc)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Mon 03/24 1:42 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (jjc) ( Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing. )
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Expedite Mon 03/24 1:34 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. Document filed by Andre Lewis. (jjc)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Protective Order Mon 03/24 1:25 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Andre Lewis. (jjc)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/21 5:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Document filed by Andre Lewis. (vfr)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Fri 03/21 9:38 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 03/18/2024) (sac)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Fri 03/21 9:36 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information. (sac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/21 9:35 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/21 9:33 AM
COMPLAINT against Juan Irizarry, Laz Parking Ltd., LLC. Document filed by Andre Lewis. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 03/21 9:35 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]